This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2020 at 06:00:36 (UTC).

Roe v. Lynch

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Roe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lynch. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1702

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

MARIANNE LYNCH, District Attorney for Prosecutorial District V

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD ROE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan Richard Bolton

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Cunniff

Attorney at McCloskey Mina Cunniff & Frawley LLC

12 City Center

Portland, ME 04101-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPENDIX filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Number of volumes: 1. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. [20-1702] (AVN) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:45 AM]

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:56 AM]

Open Document

ORDER entered: The brief and appendix filed by appellant Richard Roe on August 24, 2020 are not in compliance. Appellant Richard Roe is ordered to file a conforming brief and appendix by September 9, 2020 . The corrected brief and one copy of the corrected appendix must be served on all parties to the appeal, and the certificate(s) of service must be updated to include the new date of service. The due date for appellee's brief shall run from service of the corrected brief, in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31. [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:37 PM]

Open Document

APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:44 AM]

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:42 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Marianne Lynch filed by Attorney Jonathan R. Bolton. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2020. [20-1702] (JRB) [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:45 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:19 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Richard Roe filed by Attorney Michael A. Cunniff. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:16 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketFIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6364575-2 ] submitted by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (ATC) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6364553-2 ] submitted by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (ATC) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Number of volumes: 1. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. [20-1702] (AVN) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/10/2020 . Brief due 10/05/2020 for APPELLEE Marianne Lynch. [20-1702] (LIM) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: The brief and appendix filed by appellant Richard Roe on August 24, 2020 are not in compliance. Appellant Richard Roe is ordered to file a conforming brief and appendix by September 9, 2020 . The corrected brief and one copy of the corrected appendix must be served on all parties to the appeal, and the certificate(s) of service must be updated to include the new date of service. The due date for appellee's brief shall run from service of the corrected brief, in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31. [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Marianne Lynch filed by Attorney Jonathan R. Bolton. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2020. [20-1702] (JRB) [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 08/31/2020 for appellant Richard Roe. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Richard Roe filed by Attorney Michael A. Cunniff. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 08/03/2020 . [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 07:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less