This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:13:33 (UTC).

Roe v. Data Advantage Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Roe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Data Advantage Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-836

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Roe

John Roe

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jane Roe 1

New York, NY 10001

Defendant / Appellees

Data Advantage Group, Inc.

Geoffrey William Rayner, as CEO of DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

Greg Blumstein, as Secretary of DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

Geoffrey Arone, as Chief Financial Officer of DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

Harish Reddy, as Senior Engineer of DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

Arvind Katta, as Senior Engineer of DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

John and Jane Does, are sued in both their personal and official capacity

Jackson Lewis P.C.

Richard J. Cino, as Sr. Counsel of Jackson Lewis P.C. is sued in both his personal and official capacity

Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Dental

Gail K. Bourdeaux, as President of (A1C1) and is sued in both her personal and official capacity

Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, and its subsidiary company, HMO Colorado, Inc.

New Jersey Department of Labor, Unemployment Insurance Administration

Ronald Marino, DAG is sued in both his personal and official capacity

United States of America, AKA IRS

John and Jane Does, of IRS are sured in both their personal and official capacity

ABC Corporation 1-20

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jane Roe 1

244 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2992

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

8 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/29/2022, RECEIVED.[3299106] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:44 AM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#6

(#6) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Roe 1, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3299114] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:48 AM]

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3299118] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:51 AM]

#24

(#12) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[3322039] [22-836] [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:12 PM]

#31

(#16) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Jane Roe 1's Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 5 ] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3328646] [22-836] [Entered: 06/08/2022 09:38 AM]

#38

(#21) ORDER, dated 06/09/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/30/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3329540] [22-836] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:52 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/31/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3311863] [22-836] [Entered: 05/10/2022 09:19 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/31/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits from D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3311874] [22-836] [Entered: 05/10/2022 09:24 AM]

#11

(#11) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[3321111] [22-836] [Entered: 05/25/2022 11:32 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER, dated 06/09/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/30/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3329540] [22-836] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Jane Roe 1's Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 5 ] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3328646] [22-836] [Entered: 06/08/2022 09:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[3322039] [22-836] [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[3321111] [22-836] [Entered: 05/25/2022 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/31/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits from D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3311874] [22-836] [Entered: 05/10/2022 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/31/2022, unless Appellant Jane Roe 1, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3311863] [22-836] [Entered: 05/10/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTE: See lead case, 22-834, containing complete set of docket entries.[3299124] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3299118] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Roe 1, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3299114] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Jane Roe 1, FILED. No Service.[3299113] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3299109] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/29/2022, RECEIVED.[3299106] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jane Roe 1, FILED. [3299094] [22-836] [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant