This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/17/2019 at 06:04:53 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Griffin

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Rodriguez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Griffin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2213

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision

Brian Fischer

Thomas Griffin, Superintendent and/or Chief Executive Officer, Eastern Correctional Facility

John/Jane Doe, Nurse Administrator of Medical Services, Eastern Correctional Facility

Anthony J. Annucci

Darwin LaClair

Jane Doe, Registered Nurse, Eastern Correctional Facility

Dr. John Doe, Health Care Provide, Eastern Correctional Facility

John/Jane Doe, DOCCS Administrator

Brian McCullough

Defendant / Appellees

Roger Traynor

Dr. Bipin Bhavsar, Eastern Correctional Facility

Dr. Ann Andola, Registered Nurse, Eastern Correctional Facility, FKA Ms. Anndola, FKA Doctor Anandolas

David Jacobs

Megan McGlynn

Amanda Demshick

Nancy Anthony, Registered Nurse, Eastern Correctional Facility, FKA Ms. Anthony

Jeffrey McKoy

Dr. Gusman, Medical Director, Eastern Correctional Facility, FKA Dr. Guzman, FKA Dr. Gusman

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jose Rodriguez

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Frank Brady

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

The Capitol

Albany, NY 12224

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Karen King Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Ayelet Evrony Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Robert O'Loughlin Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#25

#22

#21

#19

#17

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

#8

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED. Service date 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2632516] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY, Frank Brady, [ # 22 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2632375] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED.[2632366] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED. Service date 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2632355] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [20], on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED.[2632192] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED. Service date 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631718] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [18], on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED.[2631579] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631041] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, informing Court of proposed due date 11/01/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2630804] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY, Ayelet Evrony for Jose Rodriguez, in case 19-2213, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2630672] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2630664] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2630649] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE, to Appellee Ann Andola, Nancy Anthony, Bipin Bhavsar, Amanda Demshick, Gusman, David Jacobs, Megan McGlynn, Jeffrey McKoy and Roger Traynor, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2625263] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/06/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623243] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623239] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623236] [19-2213] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2614264] [19-2213] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, district court receipt # ANYNDC-4804522, FILED.[2614218] [19-2213] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2614215] [19-2213] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jose Rodriguez, FILED. [2614196] [19-2213] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision is a litigant

Latest cases where Guzman is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen King Esq.