Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2020 at 06:18:59 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Amtrak, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 Rodriguez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Amtrak. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2053

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RODOLFO RODRIGUEZ

Estancia, NM 87016

Defendant / Appellees

J. PERRY

AMTRAK

C. CHAVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rodolfo Rodriguez

Attorney at Torrance County Detention Facility

209 County Road Ao49, P.O. Box 837

Estancia, NM 87016

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Attachment

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion

Open Document

[10746897] Entry of appearance filed by Rodolfo Rodriguez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-2053] [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:41 PM]

Open Document #2

attachments

Open Document #1

Brief

Open Restricted Document #3

Vol. III - Sealed Pleading

Open Restricted Document #2

Vol. II - Pleadings

Open Restricted Document #1

Vol. I - Pleadings

Open Document

[10742072] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/12/2020. Notice of appearance due on 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. Appellant's brief due on 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. Fee or 1915 forms due 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. [20-2053] [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:29 AM]

Open Document #2

Response

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746902] Deficient appellant 1915 forms received. Certified trust account statement due 06/18/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. [20-2053] [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746900] Deficient Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs or Fees (PLRA Form) received from Rodolfo Rodriguez but not filed. [20-2053] [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746897] Entry of appearance filed by Rodolfo Rodriguez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-2053] [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746896] Appellant brief filed by Rodolfo Rodriguez. Original and 4 copies (made by Clerk's office). Served on 06/07/2020 by. US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. [20-2053] [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742834] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 3. Comments: Vol. I - Pleadings; Vol. II - Pleadings; Vol. III - Sealed Pleading.. [20-2053] [Entered: 05/27/2020 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742072] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/12/2020. Notice of appearance due on 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. Appellant's brief due on 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. Fee or 1915 forms due 07/01/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. [20-2053] [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10739235] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Rodolfo Rodriguez but not filed. A letter of response (attached) sent to appellant. Served on 04/30/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-2053] [Entered: 05/11/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10734873] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/22/2020. Fee or 1915 forms due 05/22/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez. Notice of appearance due on 05/22/2020 for Rodolfo Rodriguez.. [20-2053] [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTRAK is a litigant