This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 06:02:19 (UTC).

Rodriguez-Rivera v. US

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Rodriguez-Rivera filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1537

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

OMAR E. RODRIGUEZ-RIVERA

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Omar E. Rodriguez-Rivera

Attorney at FCI Hazelton

Po Box 5000

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellant Omar E. Rodriguez-Rivera to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6260281-2 ], issue order to show cause [ # 6258765-2 ]. [19-1537] (GRC) [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. [19-1537] (MEB) [Entered: 06/26/2019 05:43 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2019. [19-1537] (MEB) [Entered: 06/12/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 06/26/2019. [19-1537] (GRC) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:12 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE filed by Appellant Omar E. Rodriguez-Rivera to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6260281-2 ], issue order to show cause [ # 6258765-2 ]. [19-1537] (GRC) [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. [19-1537] (MEB) [Entered: 06/26/2019 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2019. [19-1537] (MEB) [Entered: 06/12/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 06/26/2019. [19-1537] (GRC) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #34) filed by Appellant Omar E. Rodriguez-Rivera. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less