Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 06:00:52 (UTC).

Rodriguez Cruz v. US

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Rodriguez Cruz filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1934

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

OSCAR RODRIGUEZ-CRUZ

El Reno, OK 73036

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

William J. Keefe

801C Tremont St

Boston, MA 02118

Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz

Attorney at FTC Oklahoma

Po Box 1500

El Reno, OK 73036

James E. McCall

107 Union Wharf

Boston, MA 02109-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Beth Murrane

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Neil J. Gallagher Jr.

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Copy of Order entered November 23, 2020. Forwarded to FTC Oklahoma, PO Box 898801, Oklahoma City, OK 73189-0000. [20-1934] (JMK) [Entered: 12/11/2020 10:38 AM]

Open Document

ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: August 28, 2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:11 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney James E. McCall for Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:00 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Co-Counsel Notice of Appearance

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 12/07/2020 for Attorneys James E. McCall and William J. Keefe. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:08 PM]

Open Document

MEMORANDUM in support of certificate of appealabilty filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/19/2020. [20-1934] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (WJK) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:18 PM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to pay fee filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Filing fee due 11/09/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:14 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to pay the filing fee filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1934] (WJK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 05:53 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 11/19/2020. Date of denial by district court: August 28, 2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:39 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Copy of Order entered November 23, 2020. Forwarded to FTC Oklahoma, PO Box 898801, Oklahoma City, OK 73189-0000. [20-1934] (JMK) [Entered: 12/11/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: August 28, 2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney James E. McCall for Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz filed by Attorney William Keefe. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2020. [20-1934] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (WJK) [Entered: 11/25/2020 07:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 12/07/2020 for Attorneys James E. McCall and William J. Keefe. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketFiling fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz on 11/16/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM in support of certificate of appealabilty filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/19/2020. [20-1934] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (WJK) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to pay fee filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Filing fee due 11/09/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to pay the filing fee filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1934] (WJK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 11/19/2020. Date of denial by district court: August 28, 2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #723) filed by Appellant Oscar Rodriguez-Cruz. Fee due 10/28/2020. [20-1934] (GAK) [Entered: 10/14/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Beth Murrane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Campbell Lockhart