This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

Robinson v. Firman, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Firman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1435

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PATRICK FIRMAN

H.G. MINTER

KILMAN

BUITRAGO

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAVID WAYNE ROBINSON

Buena Vista, CO 81211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Wayne Robinson

Attorney at USP - Florence ADMAX

P.O. Box 2017

Buena Vista, CO 81211

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

[10703492] Order filed by Judges Phillips, Moritz and Carson dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to the judgment entered 2/21/2019. The appeal will proceed as to the appeal of the post-judgment orders. The clerk is directed to transmit appellant's memorandum brief to the district court as an amended notice of appeal. Proceedings in this appeal will resume as to the 10/9/2019 district court order. Further instructions regarding the appeal deadlines will be provided by separate order. See attached order for further information. Served on 12/18/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:43 AM]

Open Document #2

Amended NOA Notification Letter

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10703793] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/19/2019 07:49 AM]

Open Document

[10703501] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due on 01/27/2020 for David Wayne Robinson. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/08/2020. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:51 AM]

Open Document

[10703611] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: memorandum brief per the 10th Circuit's order of 12/18/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 12:40 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10698811] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Wayne Robinson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1435] [Entered: 11/29/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document

[10694259] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court sua sponte following the opening of this appeal. We have identified a potential jurisdictional defect. Appellant's memorandum brief due 11/26/2019 for David Wayne Robinson. Briefing on the merits of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 11/12/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:08 PM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703793] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/19/2019 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703611] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: memorandum brief per the 10th Circuit's order of 12/18/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703501] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due on 01/27/2020 for David Wayne Robinson. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/08/2020. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703494] Amended notice of appeal filed (as construed in the court's 12/18/2019 order). [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10703492] Order filed by Judges Phillips, Moritz and Carson dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to the judgment entered 2/21/2019. The appeal will proceed as to the appeal of the post-judgment orders. The clerk is directed to transmit appellant's memorandum brief to the district court as an amended notice of appeal. Proceedings in this appeal will resume as to the 10/9/2019 district court order. Further instructions regarding the appeal deadlines will be provided by separate order. See attached order for further information. Served on 12/18/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698812] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Mr. David Wayne Robinson. No certificate of service. [19-1435] [Entered: 11/29/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698811] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Wayne Robinson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1435] [Entered: 11/29/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10694259] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court sua sponte following the opening of this appeal. We have identified a potential jurisdictional defect. Appellant's memorandum brief due 11/26/2019 for David Wayne Robinson. Briefing on the merits of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 11/12/2019. [19-1435] [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10694137] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/12/2019. Notice of appearance due on 12/12/2019 for David Wayne Robinson. Fee or 1915 forms due 12/12/2019 for David Wayne Robinson [19-1435] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.