This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:25:56 (UTC).

Robinson, et al v. Kuhr Trucking, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Robinson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Kuhr Trucking. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-8074

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Plaintiff / Appellants

CORA ROBINSON

CLAY ROBINSON

Defendants

GROVE US, LLC, FKA Manitowoc Cranes, LLC

OTR WHEEL ENGINEERING, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

KUHR TRUCKING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Vance Countryman

Attorney at Vance T. Countryman, P.C.

233 Garfield Street

Lander, WY 82520

Andrew G. Moore

Attorney at Romano Law Grouop

P.O. Box 21349

West Palm Beach, FL 33416

John F. Romano

Attorney at Romano Law Grouop

P.O. Box 21349

West Palm Beach, FL 33416

Defendant Attorneys

Cary E. Hiltgen

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 North Kelley Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

James R. Baker

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 North Kelley Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Debra J. Wendtland

2161 Coffeen Avenue, Suite 301

Sheridan, WY 82801-0000

Anthony T. Wendtland

2161 Coffeen Avenue, Suite 301

Sheridan, WY 82801-0000

Deborah M. Kellam

Attorney at Hall & Evans

866 North 4Th Street, Suite 3

Laramie, WY 82072

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert C. Jarosh

Attorney at Hirst Applegate

1720 Carey Avenue, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1083

Cheyenne, WY 82003

Erin Elizabeth Berry

Attorney at Hirst Applegate

1720 Carey Avenue, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1083

Cheyenne, WY 82003

Kara Lorraine Ellsbury

Attorney at Hirst Applegate

1720 Carey Avenue, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1083

Cheyenne, WY 82003

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10712081] Appellant's appendix filed by Clay Robinson. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document

[10712078] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Clay Robinson. Served on 01/22/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:22 PM]

Open Document

[10705999] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting, as modified, Attorney motion to consolidate. Appeal numbers 19-8037 and 19-8074 are procedurally consolidated for submission to the court, and, if scheduled, oral argument. They are not, however, consolidated for briefing. The opening brief and appendix in appeal number 19-8074 remain due 01/22/2020. See order for details and additional information. Served on 12/30/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:06 PM]

Open Document

[10705600] Supplement filed by Clay Robinson in 19-8074, Cora Robinson in 19-8037, Kuhr Trucking, LLC to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Served on 12/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074, 19-8037] VC [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:37 AM]

Open Document

[10704049] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court on Appellant Clay Robinson's Motion to Consolidate appeal nos. 19-8037 and 19-8074 and the appellee's response [ # 10702195-2 ], [ # 10703890-2 ]. Upon consideration, the court takes the motion and the response under advisement and directs the appellants - on or before 12/27/2019 - to file a joint supplement to the motion as stated in the attached order. Served on 12/19/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

[10703890] Response filed by Kuhr Trucking, LLC in 19-8037, 19-8074 to Motion to Consolidate. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8037, 19-8074] KLE [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:24 AM]

Open Document

[10702391] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to consolidate appeals due on 12/23/2019 for Kuhr Trucking, LLC. Served on 12/13/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:09 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10702185] Notice of non-participation filed by Vance Countryman for Cora Robinson. Date of Service: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:43 PM]

Open Document

[10702175] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Vance Countryman for Clay Robinson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y( The parties listed are were counsel of record). Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:15 PM]

Open Document

[10702137] Docketing statement filed by Clay Robinson. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

[10702136] Notice received from Clay Robinson that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10701526] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kara Lorraine Ellsbury and Mr. Robert C. Jarosh for Kuhr Trucking, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:32 AM]

Open Document #2

Amended NOA Notification Letter

Open Document #1

Amended noa

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket[10712676] Paper copies of appellant's brief and appendix received from Clay Robinson. [19-8074] [Entered: 01/24/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket[10712198] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Paper copies of appellant's brief and appendix due 01/30/2020 by Clay Robinson. Appellee's brief now due 02/21/2020 for Kuhr Trucking, LLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-8074] [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712081] Appellant's appendix filed by Clay Robinson. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712078] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Clay Robinson. Served on 01/22/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705999] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting, as modified, Attorney motion to consolidate. Appeal numbers 19-8037 and 19-8074 are procedurally consolidated for submission to the court, and, if scheduled, oral argument. They are not, however, consolidated for briefing. The opening brief and appendix in appeal number 19-8074 remain due 01/22/2020. See order for details and additional information. Served on 12/30/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705600] Supplement filed by Clay Robinson in 19-8074, Cora Robinson in 19-8037, Kuhr Trucking, LLC to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Served on 12/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8074, 19-8037] VC [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10704049] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters are before the court on Appellant Clay Robinson's Motion to Consolidate appeal nos. 19-8037 and 19-8074 and the appellee's response [ # 10702195-2 ], [ # 10703890-2 ]. Upon consideration, the court takes the motion and the response under advisement and directs the appellants - on or before 12/27/2019 - to file a joint supplement to the motion as stated in the attached order. Served on 12/19/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703890] Response filed by Kuhr Trucking, LLC in 19-8037, 19-8074 to Motion to Consolidate. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-8037, 19-8074] KLE [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702408] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/13/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/22/2020 for Clay Robinson. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702391] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to consolidate appeals due on 12/23/2019 for Kuhr Trucking, LLC. Served on 12/13/2019. [19-8037, 19-8074] [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702185] Notice of non-participation filed by Vance Countryman for Cora Robinson. Date of Service: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702175] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Vance Countryman for Clay Robinson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y( The parties listed are were counsel of record). Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket[10702140] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/19/2019 for Margaret Botkins. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-8074] [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702137] Docketing statement filed by Clay Robinson. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702136] Notice received from Clay Robinson that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-8074] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket[10702135] Entry of appearance submitted by Vance Tyler Countryman for Appellant Clay Robinson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074]--[Edited 12/12/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/12/2019.] VC [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10701526] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kara Lorraine Ellsbury and Mr. Robert C. Jarosh for Kuhr Trucking, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket[10701520] Entry of appearance submitted by Kara L. Ellsbury; Robert C. Jarosh for Appellee Kuhr Trucking, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 12/11/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 12/11/19.] [19-8074] KLE [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10700446] Amended notice of appeal filed. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/06/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10699402] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/02/2019. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 12/17/2019 for Clay Robinson and Cora Robinson. Notice of appearance due on 12/17/2019 for Kuhr Trucking, LLC, Clay Robinson, and Cora Robinson. [19-8074] [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.