Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

Robin McMillan v. Unknown Doe

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Robin McMillan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Unknown Doe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7537

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DETECTIVE BLAKE E. VAUGHT

SECOND LIEUTENANT GEORGE DAVENPORT

DETECTIVE T. L. HULSE

UNKNOWN DOE

FAIRFAX COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBIN Y. MCMILLAN

Alexandria, VA 22306

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kimberly Pace Baucom

Attorney at FAIRFAX COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

12000 Government Center Parkway

Fairfax, VA 22035-0064

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robin Y. McMillan

7242 Fordson Road

Alexandria, VA 22306

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by George Davenport, Fairfax County Police Department, T. L. Hulse and Blake E. Vaught in 19-7563. [19-7537, 19-7563] Kimberly Baucom [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:32 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimberly P. Baucom for T. L. Hulse in 19-7537, George Davenport, Fairfax County Police Department and Blake E. Vaught in 19-7563. [1000638164] [19-7537, 19-7563] Kimberly Baucom [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:30 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [10] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. [1000635284] [19-7563, 19-7537] JHM [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:41 PM]

#9

(#9) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robin Y. McMillan in 19-7537, 19-7563. [19-7537, 19-7563] JHM [Entered: 11/20/2019 05:36 PM]

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 19-7537, 19-7563 Due: 11/07/2019 [19-7537, 19-7563] JHM [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:00 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-7563 with 19-7537. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. [1000613459] [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:13 AM]

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/06/2019. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:50 AM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. Informal Opening Brief due 11/18/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:46 AM]

#2

IFP application

2 #1

Fee notice

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01269-LO-IDD. Case manager: JMoore. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:42 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by George Davenport, Fairfax County Police Department, T. L. Hulse and Blake E. Vaught in 19-7563. [19-7537, 19-7563] Kimberly Baucom [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimberly P. Baucom for T. L. Hulse in 19-7537, George Davenport, Fairfax County Police Department and Blake E. Vaught in 19-7563. [1000638164] [19-7537, 19-7563] Kimberly Baucom [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [10] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. [1000635284] [19-7563, 19-7537] JHM [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#10) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Robin Y. McMillan in 19-7563, 19-7537. [19-7563, 19-7537] JHM [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robin Y. McMillan in 19-7537, 19-7563. [19-7537, 19-7563] JHM [Entered: 11/20/2019 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENTAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court record (paper) requested? N/A. [19-7563, 19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 19-7537, 19-7563 Due: 11/07/2019 [19-7537, 19-7563] JHM [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-7563 with 19-7537. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. [1000613459] [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01269-LO-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/06/2019. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. Informal Opening Brief due 11/18/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Robin Y. McMillan - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/22/2019 Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01269-LO-IDD. Mailed to: Robin McMillan. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01269-LO-IDD. Case manager: JMoore. [19-7537] JHM [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRFAX COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant