This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:34:06 (UTC).

Roberto Castellanos v. Kristen Ziman, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Roberto Castellanos filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kristen Ziman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1253

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN DOE, 1 & 2

KRISTEN ZIMAN

JOSEPH MCMAHON

KEEFE JACKSON

VINCENT COYLE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERTO A. CASTELLANOS

Centralia, IL 62801-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Roberto A. Castellanos

Attorney at CENTRALIA CORRECTIONAL CENTER

P.O. Box 7711

Centralia, IL 62801-0000

 

Court Documents

3 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#1

Civil Rights Case

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

3 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7062342] [20-1253] (CG) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Roberto A. Castellanos leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 02/11/2020. [3] [7062349] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/16/2020 [20-1253] (CM) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7062342] [20-1253] (CG) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Date IFP denied: 02/11/2020. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Roberto A. Castellanos by 01/23/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/16/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 02/27/2020. [1] [7062321] [20-1253] (CG) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.