This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:01:45 (UTC).

Robert Wazney v. Sharon Chabassole

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Robert Wazney filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Sharon Chabassole. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1004

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT WILLIAM WAZNEY

Bishopville, SC 29010-2021

Defendant / Appellee

SHARON RENEE CHABASSOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert William Wazney

Attorney at LEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

990 Wisacky Highway

Bishopville, SC 29010-2021

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Paul L. Held

Attorney at PAUL L. HELD LAW OFFICE

138 North Main Street

Sumter, SC 29151

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Document

6 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Document

7 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01012-HMH. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:13 PM]

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: R. Wazney. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:38 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert William Wazney. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:41 PM]

#4

(#4) MOTION by Robert William Wazney to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 01/20/2020 US mail. [1000669704] [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:42 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCUMENT - district court information by Robert William Wazney. [1000685744] [20-1004] TW [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCUMENT - notice of appeal by Robert William Wazney. [1000685743] [20-1004] TW [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01012-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Robert William Wazney to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 01/20/2020 US mail. [1000669704] [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert William Wazney. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: R. Wazney. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-01012-HMH. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-1004] CT [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less