This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2020 at 06:03:20 (UTC).

Robert Walker v. United Parcel Service Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Robert Walker filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Parcel Service Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10168

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY

CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND

CALIL LAW, P.A.

JORGE ALBERTO CALIL

LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC.

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.

JASON BRIAN PHILLIPS

Orlando, FL 32829

KONE, INC.

TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 769 HOLDING CORPORATION, INC.

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES

LAW OFFICES OF MARIA C. DANTES SANCHEZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT WALKER

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33310

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gary John Guzzi

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

3 Brickell City Ctr, 98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Antonio D. Morin

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

3 Brickell City Ctr, 98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Scott A. Bassman

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

110 Se 6 St Ste 1850

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Sanaz Alempour

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

600 N Pine Island Rd Ste 500

Plantation, FL 33324

Alexandra Valdes

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

Maureen Berard Soles

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Denis Durkin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Francis Joseph Carey

Attorney at Central States Funds

9377 W Higgins Rd

Rosemont, IL 60018-4943

Roy D. Wasson

Attorney at Wasson & Associates, Chartered

28 W Flagler St Ste 600

Miami, FL 33130

Cornelius C. Demps

Attorney at Smoak Chistolini & Barnett, PLLC

320 W Kennedy Blvd Fl 4

Tampa, FL 33606

William G.K. Smoak

Attorney at Smoak Chistolini & Barnett, PLLC

320 W Kennedy Blvd Fl 4

Tampa, FL 33606

Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins

Attorney at Smoak Chistolini & Barnett, PLLC

320 W Kennedy Blvd Fl 4

Tampa, FL 33606

Jason Brian Phillips

Attorney at J. Brian Phillips, PA

8857 Warick Shore Crossing

Orlando, FL 32829

Jesse Butler

Attorney at Dickinson & Gibbons, PA

401 N Cattlemen Rd Ste 300

Sarasota, FL 34232

D. Marcus Braswell Jr.

Attorney at Sugarman & Susskind, PA

100 Miracle Mile Ste 300

Coral Gables, FL 33134-5430

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

110 Se 6Th St Fl 10

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Shane Weaver

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1515 N Flagler Dr Ste 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Magdalena Anna Ozarowski

Attorney at Department of Financial Services

200 E Gaines St Ste 612

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Walker

4001 Sw Melbourne St

Port St Lucie, FL 34953

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Robert Walker has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [ # 8707934-2 ] [ # 8699237-2 ][ # 8707934-3 ] [ # 8697068-2 ] [ # 8699237-3 ] [ # 8697068-3 ] [ # 8697068-4 ] [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roy D. Wasson for Jorge Alberto Calil and Calil Law, P.A. Roy D. Wasson for Calil Law, P.A. and Jorge Alberto Calil. [19-10168] (ECF: Roy Wasson) [Entered: 03/12/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction, to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8707934-1] [19-10168] (ECF: Maureen Soles) [Entered: 02/28/2019 05:22 PM]

Open Document

Notice of Joinder filed by Attorney Alexandra Valdes for Appellee The Travelers Indemnity Company. [19-10168] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction, for summary affirmance filed by Florida Department of Health. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8699237-1] [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cornelius C. Demps for Appellee United Parcel Service Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10168] (ECF: Cornelius Demps) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely, to dismiss appeal as frivolous filed by United Parcel Service Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8697068-1] [19-10168] -[Edited 02/15/2019 by JC] (ECF: Cornelius Demps) [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shane Weaver - Appellee Florida Department of Health. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:30 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shane Weaver - Appellee Florida Department of Health [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:29 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kelly Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service, Inc. Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service Inc.. [19-10168] (ECF: Kelly Nicole Charles-Collins) [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document #2

CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kelly Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service, Inc. Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service Inc.. [19-10168] (ECF: Kelly Nicole Charles-Collins) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:49 AM]

Open Document #5

District Court Judgment, DE # 130

Open Document #4

District Court Order, DE # 129

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 140

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Robert Walker has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [ # 8707934-2 ] [ # 8699237-2 ][ # 8707934-3 ] [ # 8697068-2 ] [ # 8699237-3 ] [ # 8697068-3 ] [ # 8697068-4 ] [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roy D. Wasson for Jorge Alberto Calil and Calil Law, P.A. Roy D. Wasson for Calil Law, P.A. and Jorge Alberto Calil. [19-10168] (ECF: Roy Wasson) [Entered: 03/12/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction, to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8707934-1] [19-10168] (ECF: Maureen Soles) [Entered: 02/28/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Joinder filed by Attorney Alexandra Valdes for Appellee The Travelers Indemnity Company. [19-10168] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction, for summary affirmance filed by Florida Department of Health. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8699237-1] [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cornelius C. Demps for Appellee United Parcel Service Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10168] (ECF: Cornelius Demps) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service Inc. and Cornelius C. Demps for United Parcel Service Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely, to dismiss appeal as frivolous filed by United Parcel Service Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8697068-1] [19-10168] -[Edited 02/15/2019 by JC] (ECF: Cornelius Demps) [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shane Weaver - Appellee Florida Department of Health. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shane Weaver - Appellee Florida Department of Health [19-10168] (ECF: Shane Weaver) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Robert Walker. No hearings. [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Robert Walker. [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert Walker. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/30/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Antonio Morin for Appellees, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Helmsman Management Services LLC and Law Offices of Maria C. Dantes Sanchez [19-10168] (ECF: Antonio Morin) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gary John Guzzi for Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Law Offices of Maria C. Dantes Sanchez, Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.. [19-10168] (ECF: Gary Guzzi) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Francis Joseph Carey for Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund. [19-10168] (ECF: Francis Carey) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kelly Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service, Inc. Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service Inc.. [19-10168] (ECF: Kelly Nicole Charles-Collins) [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cornelius Demps for UPS [19-10168] (ECF: Cornelius Demps) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kelly Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service, Inc. Kelly Nicole H. Charles-Collins for United Parcel Service Inc.. [19-10168] (ECF: Kelly Nicole Charles-Collins) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Walker on 01/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/28/2019 as to Appellant Robert Walker. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2019 as to Appellee United Parcel Service Inc. [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less