This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/04/2019 at 06:04:52 (UTC).

Robert W Mauthe MD PC v. Spreemo Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Robert W Mauthe MD PC filed an Other lawsuit against Spreemo Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1470

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT W MAUTHE MD PC, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Individually and as the Representative of a Class of Similarly-Situated Persons

Defendant / Appellees

HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC

SPREEMO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard E. Shenkan Esq.

Molly S. Gantman Esq.

Daniel J. Cohen Esq.

Phillip A. Bock Esq.

Andrew J. Reilly Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bart T. Murphy Esq.

Derek R. Molter Esq.

Frederick A. Tecce Esq.

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

Open Document #1

Transcirpt Purchase Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

DC Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bart T. Murphy on behalf of Appellee(s) Spreemo, Inc. and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. [19-1470] (BTM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by UBIQUS for date(s) of 1/8/2019. [19-1470] (JMG) [Entered: 04/22/2019 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Frederick A. Tecce, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Spreemo, Inc. and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. [19-1470] (FAT) [Entered: 03/19/2019 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 03/19/2019 , to be filed by 04/22/2019. (MB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Robert W Mauthe MD PC advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: January 8, 2019, to be filed by Joan Carr. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Robert W Mauthe MD PC, received. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Robert W Mauthe MD PC, filed. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard Shenkan on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert W. Mauthe, M.D., P.C.. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel J. Cohen on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert W. Mauthe, M.D., P.C.. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Phillip A. Bock on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert W. Mauthe, M.D., P.C.. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Robert W Mauthe MD PC, filed. [19-1470] (PAB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, filed. [19-1470] (DRM) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Spreemo Inc, filed. [19-1470] (DRM) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek R. Molter on behalf of Appellee(s) Spreemo, Inc. and The Hartford Financial Services Group. [19-1470] (DRM) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNotice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 03/07/2019. (DW) [Entered: 03/08/2019 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (Clerk) The above-docketed appeal is hereby STAYED pending decision in Appeal No. 18-2119, Robert W. Mauthe, M.D., P.C. v. National Imaging Associates, Inc. and Appeal No. 18-2894, Robert W. Mauthe, M.D., P.C. v. Optum, Inc. Within fourteen (14) days of the date the second mandate issues in these cases, the parties must advise the Court, in writing, what effect, if any, the decisions in Nos. 18-2119 and 19-2894 have on the pending appeal, filed. (MB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Amended Notice of Appeal filed 02/28/2019 received from Clerk of District Court. (MB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Robert W Mauthe MD PC in District Court No. 5-18-cv-01902. (MB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less