This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:06:32 (UTC).

Robert Voskanyan v. Joe Lizarraga

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Robert Voskanyan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Joe Lizarraga. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55152

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ROBERT VOSKANYAN

Chino, CA 91708

Respondent / Appellee

JOE A. LIZARRAGA, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Robert Voskanyan

Attorney at CIM - CALIFORNIA INSTITUTION FOR MEN

P.O. Box 600

Chino, CA 91708

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Taylor Nguyen

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan amended motion responding Court Order and request COA. Dated 03/16/2020. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11639789] (RL) [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:57 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan requests application for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/14/2020. [11624434] (RL) [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:08 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan requests application for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/14/2020. [11608038] (RL) [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:20 AM]

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan amended motion responding Court Order and request COA. Dated 03/16/2020. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11639789] (RL) [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan requests application for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/14/2020. [11624434] (RL) [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Robert Voskanyan requests application for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/14/2020. [11608038] (RL) [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 12/19/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11595569] (OC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.