This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

Robert McNeil, et al v. G. Harvey, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Robert McNeil filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against G Harvey. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5127

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Christopher R. Cooper

G. Michael Harvey

Amy Berman Jackson

Dale A. Drozd

Plaintiff / Appellees

Lee C. Prymmer

Sarasota, FL 34233

William B. McGarvin

O'Fallon, MO 63368

Harold R. Stanley

Talala, OK 74080

Mark Crumpacker

Simi Valley, CA 93063

Ebenezer K. Howe, IV

Casper, WY 82609

Barry E. Brooks

Kemp, TX 75143

Gregory Albert Darst

Lima, OH 45807

Lynne M. Kuchenbuch

Reardan, WA 99029

Gary Dwaileebe

Dauphin Island, AL 36528

Louis Ronald Depolo

Garland, TX 75043

Melba Ford

Hanford, CA 93230

Plaintiff / Appellants

Robert A. McNeil

Hurst, TX 76054

Michael Beals Ellis

Rice, TX 75155

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Anthony Thomas Sheehan

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Lee C. Prymmer

4699 Springmeadow Lane

Sarasota, FL 34233

William B. McGarvin

2977 Highway K, Apt. 235

O'Fallon, MO 63368

Harold R. Stanley

3705 Big Sky Lane

Talala, OK 74080

Mark Crumpacker

4212 E. Los Angeles Avenue #4335

Simi Valley, CA 93063

Ebenezer K. Howe IV

3001 Thelma Drive, Apartment 441

Casper, WY 82609

Barry E. Brooks

5651 County Road 4068

Kemp, TX 75143

Gregory Albert Darst

185 Saddlebrook Drive

Lima, OH 45807

Lynne M. Kuchenbuch

50079 Fisher Road East

Reardan, WA 99029

Gary Dwaileebe

Pmb 212

Dauphin Island, AL 36528

Louis Ronald Depolo

462 Birchwood Drive

Garland, TX 75043

Melba Ford

905 Ross Way

Hanford, CA 93230

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert A. McNeil

729 Grapevine Highway #148

Hurst, TX 76054

Michael Beals Ellis

5052 Ne County Road 220

Rice, TX 75155

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION [1791725] to hold case in abeyance, or to extend time to file initial submissions, styled as "emergency motion to stay briefing schedule," filed by Michael Beals Ellis and Robert A. McNeil (Service Date: 06/04/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 5 Pages. [19-5127] [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:00 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1791148] to require appellants to serve in this appeal only the lead appellate counsel for the defendant judges filed by Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson (Service Date: 06/05/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 905 words. [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:57 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1789520] received from Robert McNeil [signed for on 05/15/2019] for order [1786613-2] sent to Appellant Robert A. McNeil [19-5127] [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788236] filed by Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ] [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:47 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788235] filed by Anthony T. Sheehan on behalf of Appellees Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson. [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:45 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1786591] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/21/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/21/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786475] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01720-RC filed by Michael Beals Ellis and Robert A. McNeil. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5127. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 12:15 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1791699] marked "Return to sender - unclaimed - unable to forward". Certified Mail [1786613-2] had been sent to Party Michael Beals Ellis. [19-5127] [Entered: 06/07/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1791725] to hold case in abeyance, or to extend time to file initial submissions, styled as "emergency motion to stay briefing schedule," filed by Michael Beals Ellis and Robert A. McNeil (Service Date: 06/04/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 5 Pages. [19-5127] [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1791148] to require appellants to serve in this appeal only the lead appellate counsel for the defendant judges filed by Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson (Service Date: 06/05/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 905 words. [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1789520] received from Robert McNeil [signed for on 05/15/2019] for order [1786613-2] sent to Appellant Robert A. McNeil [19-5127] [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788236] filed by Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ] [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788235] filed by Anthony T. Sheehan on behalf of Appellees Christopher R. Cooper, Dale A. Drozd, G. Michael Harvey and Amy Berman Jackson. [19-5127] (Sheehan, Anthony) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1786613] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7007 0710 0004 7196 8788 for Robert McNeil and 7007 0710 0004 7196 8795 for Michael Ellis] of order [ # 1786591-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/06/2019 from Michael Beals Ellis and Robert A. McNeil. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786591] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/21/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/21/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786475] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01720-RC filed by Michael Beals Ellis and Robert A. McNeil. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5127. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5127] [Entered: 05/07/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.