This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

Robert McCormies v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Robert McCormies filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2471

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Robert P. McCormies

Plattsburg, MO 64477

Defendant / Appellees

Millsap & Singer, P.C.

PennyMac Loan Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert P. McCormies

412 N. Main

Plattsburg, MO 64477

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Charles Smathers Pullium III

Attorney at MILLSAP & SINGER

612 Spirit Drive

Chesterfield, MO 63005-0000

Andrew Muller

Attorney at STINSON LLP

Suite 2900, 1201 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106-2150

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 5/28/19, Judgment 5/28/19, Order 7/12/19. [4808132] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/12/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4808133] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4808127] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:02 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Mr. Robert P. McCormies w/service by USCA8 on 08/13/2019. [4818652] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN RE-FILED BELOW AS A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS -- REPLY to clerk order pay docketing fee [ # 4808133-2 ], clerk order [ # 4808133-3 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Robert P. McCormies w/service 08/08/2019. [4817372] [19-2471]--[Edited 08/13/2019 by TMF] REPLY. [4817372] [19-2471]--[Edited 08/13/2019 by TMF] (RPM) [Entered: 08/08/2019 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/12/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4808133] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 5/28/19, Judgment 5/28/19, Order 7/12/19. [4808132] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4808127] [19-2471] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.