This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:04 (UTC).

Robert Lindbloom v. Manatee County, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Robert Lindbloom filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Manatee County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12680

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TANYA SHAW

KATHERINE ZAMBONI

TOM WOOTEN

DONALD COURTNEY

MANATEE COUNTY, a political Subdivision of the State of Florida

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT KELVIN LINDBLOOM

Parrish, FL 34219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shannon L. Kelly

Attorney at Allen Norton & Blue, PA

1477 W Fairbanks Ave Ste 100

Winter Park, FL 32789-7108

Mark E. Levitt

Attorney at Allen Norton & Blue, PA

1477 W Fairbanks Ave Ste 100

Winter Park, FL 32789-7108

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Kelvin Lindbloom

7005 121St Ave E

Parrish, FL 34219

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8867218-2 ] Appellants brief due on 09/09/2019. [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:13 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon L. Kelly for Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. [19-12680] (ECF: Shannon Kelly) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:27 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 09/09/2019 filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8867218-1] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:09 AM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DC #30 Order

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:10 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark E. Levitt for Appellees Donald Courtney, Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12680] (ECF: Mark Levitt) [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark E. Levitt for Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. [19-12680] (ECF: Mark Levitt) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:26 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8867218-2 ] Appellants brief due on 09/09/2019. [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 09/09/2019 filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8867218-1] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark E. Levitt for Appellees Donald Courtney, Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12680] (ECF: Mark Levitt) [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon L. Kelly for Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. [19-12680] (ECF: Shannon Kelly) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark E. Levitt for Manatee County, Tanya Shaw, Tom Wooten and Katherine Zamboni. [19-12680] (ECF: Mark Levitt) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom on 07/13/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Robert Kelvin Lindbloom. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Manatee County [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.