This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/26/2021 at 06:08:38 (UTC).

Robert Levy, et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Robert Levy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Casualty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1446

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD

Plaintiff / Appellants

Farhad Moshiri, D.M.D., M.S., P.C., doing business as Moshiri Orthodontics

Trisha M. Young, D.M.D., P.C.

Vanessa N. Keller, D.M.D.

Mazyar Moshiri, D.M.D., M.S., P.C., doing business as Moshiri Orthodontics

Robert Levy, D.M.D., LLC, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Rivka Goldenhersh, D.M.D., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Gordon

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Angela Belle Kennedy

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Anthony John Anscombe

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

Suite 4700, 227 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan M. Freiman

Attorney at WIGGIN & DANA

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kevin Paul Green

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

2227 S. State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

Richard Steven Cornfeld

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Anthony S. Bruning Jr.

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Daniel S. Levy

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Thomas Paul Rosenfeld

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

2227 S. State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

Ryan L. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Anthony S. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Alfredo Torrijos

Attorney at ARIAS & OZZELLO

Suite 1400, 6701 Center Drive West

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Mark C. Goldenberg

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

Route 157, 2227 S. State

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5015782-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld. Brief of Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young due 05/17/2021. Appendix due on 05/17/2021. [5016285] [21-1446] (JPP) [Entered: 03/18/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld for Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young correcting [ # 5015782-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5015984] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27/Rule 5/Rule 21/Rule 35/Rule 40], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 5015782-2 ], submitted by Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld in 21-1446 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE YOUR MOTION [21-1446] (JPP) [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/17/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld for Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young w/service 03/17/2021. [5015782] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young. No Transcript[5013656] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/11/2021 [5013655] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young - w/service 03/11/2021. [5013650] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/11/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel S. Levy for Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young w/service 03/05/2021 [5011756] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jonathan M. Freiman for Appellees Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Sentinel Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company w/service 03/05/2021 [5011357] [21-1446] (JMF) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group and Twin City Fire Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [5011342] [21-1446] (ABK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Angela B. Kennedy for Appellees Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group and Twin City Fire Insurance Company w/service 03/05/2021 [5011328] [21-1446] (ABK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young. - FOR CAL [5011226] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Richard S. Cornfeld for Appellants Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young w/service 03/04/2021 [5011203] [21-1446] (RSC) [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: The mandate issued in this appeal is recalled as it was prematurely issued. [5009636] [21-1446] (CMD) [Entered: 03/01/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5009581] [21-1446] (CMD) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Patrick Kenny for Appellees Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Sentinel Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company w/service 03/01/2021 [5009510] [21-1446] (PJK) [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/06/2021. Appendix due 04/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANTS, Rivka Goldenhersh, Vanessa N. Keller, Robert Levy, Farhad Moshiri, Mazyar Moshiri and Trisha M. Young due 04/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5008596] [21-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum & order 2/16/21, judgment 2/16/21. [5008584] [21-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5008568] [21-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant