This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2021 at 12:03:57 (UTC).

Robert Jones v. Warden, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Robert Jones filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11853

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

N. LAWSON, Capt.

T JONES, Officer

MCCOVERY

WARDEN

COLEMAN

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT JONES

Clio, AL 36017-2615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 S Ripley Stpo Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36130-1501

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Avepo Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Jones

Attorney at Easterling CF - Inmate Legal Mail

200 Wallace Dr

Clio, AL 36017-2615

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Final Judgment doc 26

Open Document #4

DC Order doc 25

Open Document #5

DC R&R doc 24

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: Letter on CIP form as to Appellant Robert Jones.. [Entered: 07/06/2021 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Robert Jones failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bart Gregory Harmon for Appellees Coleman, T Jones, N. Lawson, McCovery and Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11853] (ECF: Bart Harmon) [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bart Gregory Harmon for Coleman, T Jones, N. Lawson, McCovery and Warden. [21-11853] (ECF: Bart Harmon) [Entered: 06/28/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bart Gregory Harmon for Coleman, Warden, N. Lawson, McCovery and T Jones and Steven Marshall for Coleman, Warden, N. Lawson, McCovery and T Jones. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/28/2021 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert Jones. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/22/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Jones on 05/27/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. 05/28/2021. [Entered: 06/01/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLEMAN is a litigant

Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant