This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 06:16:09 (UTC).

Robert Jones v. Brandon Stryker, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Robert Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Brandon Stryker. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5130

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

PHILIP MICHAEL JINKS

Plaintiff / Appellee

ROBERT DENNIS JONES

Mountain City, TN 37683

Defendant / Appellant

BRANDON STRYKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Robert Dennis Jones

Attorney at Northeast Correctional Complex

P.O. Box 5000

Mountain City, TN 37683

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

John Morris Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. John Morris Kizer for Brandon Stryker. Certificate of Service: 03/24/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:44 PM]

#7

(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. John Morris Kizer for Appellant Brandon Stryker.. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:06 AM]

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Morris Kizer for Appellant Brandon Stryker Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/15/2021 08:50 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Brandon Stryker by John M. Kizer. Certificate of Service: 02/12/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:27 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/24/2021; appellee brief due 04/26/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:57 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Brandon Stryker. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:39 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. John Morris Kizer for Brandon Stryker. Certificate of Service: 03/24/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. John Morris Kizer for Appellant Brandon Stryker.. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Morris Kizer for Appellant Brandon Stryker Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/15/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. John Morris Kizer for Brandon Stryker. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/15/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Brandon Stryker by John M. Kizer. Certificate of Service: 02/12/2021. [21-5130] (JMK) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/24/2021; appellee brief due 04/26/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Brandon Stryker. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Kizer