This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 06:07:09 (UTC).

Robert Jones v. Brandon Stryker, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Robert Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Brandon Stryker. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5152

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRANDON STRYKER

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT DENNIS JONES

Mountain City, TN 37683

Defendant / Appellee

PHILIP MICHAEL JINKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Dennis Jones

Attorney at Northeast Correctional Complex

P.O. Box 5000

Mountain City, TN 37683

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John Morris Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/06/2021; appellee brief due 06/08/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:02 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Dennis Jones. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:52 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/06/2021; appellee brief due 06/08/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Dennis Jones. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Kizer