This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/04/2022 at 06:01:56 (UTC).

Robert Johnson v. Schneider National Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Robert Johnson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Schneider National Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1556

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT JOHNSON, individually and on behlaf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James L. Simon

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SIMON & SIMON

5000 Rockside Road, Liberty Plaza

Independence, OH 44131

Michael L. Fradin

Attorney at MICHAEL FRADIN, ATTORNEY AT LAW

8401 Crawford Avenue

Skokie, IL 60076

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joel H. Spitz

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1818

Michael R. Phillips

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1818

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Fradin for Appellant Robert Johnson. [2] [7229349] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1556] [2] [7229349] [22-1556]--[Edited 04/13/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Fradin, Michael) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:13 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Robert Johnson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7229460] [22-1556] (Fradin, Michael) [Entered: 04/13/2022 10:18 AM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom on Thursday, April 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [4] [7229756] [22-1556] (FP) [Entered: 04/14/2022 09:34 AM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/31/2022 for Robert Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/30/2022 for Schneider National Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/21/2022 for Appellant Robert Johnson. JB [7229761] [22-1556] (FP) [Entered: 04/14/2022 09:40 AM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael R. Phillips for Appellee Schneider National Inc.. [6] [7230385] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1556] --[Edited 04/18/2022 by ER - added Attorney Michael R. Phillips] (Phillips, Michael) [Entered: 04/18/2022 02:46 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 33, this appeal is STAYED. Counsel for appellant and appellee shall provide a JOINT STATUS REPORT by electronic mail to Circuit Mediator Jillisa Brittan by 5/26/22. [7232733] [22-1556] (AP) [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:35 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed District Court order dated 06/01/2022, granting joint motion for an indicative ruling. The Court indicates that, upon remand, it would enter an order approving the parties' negotiated settlement of Plaintiff's claims and dismiss this action with prejudice. Forwarded to SCR. [10] [7239829] [22-1556] (CAG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 01:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed District Court order dated 06/01/2022, granting joint motion for an indicative ruling. The Court indicates that, upon remand, it would enter an order approving the parties' negotiated settlement of Plaintiff's claims and dismiss this action with prejudice. Forwarded to SCR. [10] [7239829] [22-1556] (CAG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney James L. Simon for Appellant Robert Johnson has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [9] [7234832] [22-1556] (SK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. Michael L. Fradin for Appellant Robert Johnson has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7234825] [22-1556] (SK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 33, this appeal is STAYED. Counsel for appellant and appellee shall provide a JOINT STATUS REPORT by electronic mail to Circuit Mediator Jillisa Brittan by 5/26/22. [7232733] [22-1556] (AP) [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael R. Phillips for Appellee Schneider National Inc.. [6] [7230385] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1556] --[Edited 04/18/2022 by ER - added Attorney Michael R. Phillips] (Phillips, Michael) [Entered: 04/18/2022 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/31/2022 for Robert Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/30/2022 for Schneider National Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/21/2022 for Appellant Robert Johnson. JB [7229761] [22-1556] (FP) [Entered: 04/14/2022 09:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom on Thursday, April 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [4] [7229756] [22-1556] (FP) [Entered: 04/14/2022 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Robert Johnson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7229460] [22-1556] (Fradin, Michael) [Entered: 04/13/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Fradin for Appellant Robert Johnson. [2] [7229349] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1556] [2] [7229349] [22-1556]--[Edited 04/13/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Fradin, Michael) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Robert Johnson by 04/12/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 04/19/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/16/2022 for Robert Johnson. [1] [7227689] [22-1556] (CG) [Entered: 04/06/2022 10:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel H Spitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Phillips