This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/07/2020 at 06:05:42 (UTC).

Robert Johnson v. Performant Recovery, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Robert Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Performant Recovery, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15022

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT W. JOHNSON

Bronx, NY 10469

Defendant / Appellees

PERFORMANT RECOVERY, INC.

STATE OF NEW YORK, Department of Taxation & Finance

ADAM QUINTAL

NEW YORK STATE, ASSESSMENT RECEIVABLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert W. Johnson

3345 Fish Avenue

Bronx, NY 10469

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

June Dittus Coleman

Attorney at Messer Strickler, Ltd.

225 West Washington Street, Suite 575

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (RAP, MDS and NRS) [11599566] (RR) [Entered: 02/18/2020 10:42 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and N. RANDY SMITH) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable); Bird v. Reese, 875 F.2d 256 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (order denying a motion for default judgment is not a final appealable order). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [11573774] (JPD) [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:47 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Robert W. Johnson letter dated re: request copy of Circuit Rules, Docket sheet, and all filed documents. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11572350] (JFF) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:33 PM]

#3

(#3) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Robert W. Johnson opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 01/17/2020. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11571399] (KT) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:41 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Robert W. Johnson motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, for summary judgment . Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/17/2020. [11569035] (JFF) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:14 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (RAP, MDS and NRS) [11599566] (RR) [Entered: 02/18/2020 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and N. RANDY SMITH) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable); Bird v. Reese, 875 F.2d 256 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (order denying a motion for default judgment is not a final appealable order). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [11573774] (JPD) [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) Sent Appellant a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules, a copy of the docket sheet and a copy of his Ninth Circuit filings in this appeal in response to his letter of request filed on 01/21/2020. [11572784] (JR) [Entered: 01/24/2020 08:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Robert W. Johnson letter dated re: request copy of Circuit Rules, Docket sheet, and all filed documents. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11572350] (JFF) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Robert W. Johnson opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 01/17/2020. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11571399] (KT) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Robert W. Johnson motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, for summary judgment . Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/17/2020. [11569035] (JFF) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Robert W. Johnson opening brief due 03/10/2020. Appellees New York State, Assessment Receivables, Performant Recovery, Inc., Adam Quintal and State of New York answering brief due 04/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11553746] (RT) [Entered: 01/07/2020 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANT RECOVERY, INC. F/K/A DIVERSIFIED COLLECTIONS SERVICES, INC., AS AGENT FOR ACCESS GROUP, INC. D/B/A ACCESS GRO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer June D. Coleman