This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:54 (UTC).

Robert Harris v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Robert Harris filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12731

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ROBERT MARVIN HARRIS

Coleman, FL 33521-1033

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Robert Marvin Harris

Attorney at USP Coleman I - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1033

Coleman, FL 33521-1033

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Stephen Schlessinger

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris was filed on 07/17/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8858957-1] [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:45 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris was filed on 06/27/2019. Docket Entry 4. [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Document #1

HAB-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12731] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:32 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-11 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schlessinger [19-12731] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #4

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:29 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #3

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-12731] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document #1

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2019. [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:29 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2019. [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: filed by Robert Marvin Harris is returned unfiled because the briefing schedule has not yet issued. [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8858957-1] [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12731] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schlessinger [19-12731] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Robert Marvin Harris. [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-12731] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris was filed on 07/17/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Robert Marvin Harris was filed on 06/27/2019. Docket Entry 4. [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Robert Marvin Harris on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less