This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2021 at 06:41:39 (UTC).

Robert Glen v. Trip Advisor LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Robert Glen filed an Other lawsuit against Trip Advisor LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1842

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

EXPEDIA INC

TRAVELSCAPE LLC, DBA Travelocity

HOTELS.COM LP

HOTELS.COM GP LLC

KAYAK SOFTWARE CORP

TRIP NETWORK LLC, DBA Cheap Tickets

EXPEDIA GROUP INC

TRIP ADVISOR LLC

TRIP ADVISOR INC

ORBITZ LLC

BOOKING HOLDINGS INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT M. GLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brittany Giusini Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

919 North Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

919 North Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jane M.N. Webre Esq.

Attorney at Scott Douglass & McConnico

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

David D. Shank Esq.

Attorney at Scott Douglass & McConnico

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Michael C. McCutcheon Esq.

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie

300 East Randolph Street, Suite 5000

Chicago, IL 60601

L. Andrew S. Riccio Esq.

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie

452 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

John P. DiTomo Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Michael A. Duffy Esq.

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie

300 East Randolph Street, Suite 5000

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathan A. Choa Esq.

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Plaza, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jacob S. Gardener Esq.

Attorney at Walden Macht & Haran

250 Vesey Street, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Sean T. Haran Esq.

Attorney at Walden Macht & Haran

250 Vesey Street, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Craig Boneau Esq.

Attorney at Reid Collins & Tsai

1301 South Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite C-300

Austin, TX 78746

Jonathan M. Kass Esq.

Attorney at Reid Collins & Tsai

1007 North Orange Street, Nemours Building, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ryan M. Goldstein Esq.

Attorney at Reid Collins & Tsai

1301 South Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite C-300

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

35 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

35 #1

Mediation Instructions

#34

#33

#32

#31

30 #3

Order granting motion to dismiss filed March 30, 2021. Case 1:19-cv-01809-LPS Dk

30 #2

Decision granting motion to dismiss filed March 30, 2021. Case 1:19-cv-01809-LPS

30 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Caption

1 #3

District Court Memorandum and Opinion

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Civil Case Docketed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob S. Gardener on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. [21-1842] (JSG) [Entered: 06/04/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean T. Haran on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. [21-1842] (STH) [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trip Network LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David D. Shank on behalf of Appellee(s) Trip Network, Inc.; Expedia Group, Inc.; Expedia, Inc.; Hotels.com LP; Hotels.com GP, LLC; Travelscape, LLC; and Orbitz, LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 06/01/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Brittany Giusini, Esq. and Beth E. Moskow-Schnoll, Esq. for Trip Network LLC requesting Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 06/02/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Craig Boneau, Esq., Ryan M. Goldstein, Esq. and Jonathan M. Kass, Esq. for Robert M. Glen requesting Concise Summary on or before 06/02/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Travelscape LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Orbitz LLC. [21-1842] (DDS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Craig A. Boneau on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert M. Glen. [21-1842] (CB) [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan A. Choa on behalf of Appellee(s) TripAdvisor, Inc. and TripAdvisor LLC. (JAC) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Kayak Software Corporation in 21-1842. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Booking Holdings Inc in 21-1842. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from L Andrew S. Riccio on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael C. McCutcheon on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Duffy on behalf of Appellee(s) Booking Holdings Inc., Kayak Software Corporation. (MAD) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The actions at Nos. 21-1842 & 21-1843 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the filing of a single brief, reply brief, and joint appendix by the appellant and for disposition. The appellees are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. The appellees may choose to file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App.P. 28(i). [21-1842, 21-1843] SEE DOCKET FOR FULL TEXT OF ORDER (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Robert M Glen in District Court No. 1-19-cv-01809. (CLW) [Entered: 04/30/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trip Network, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelscape, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAYAK SOFTWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Expedia Group, Inc. is a litigant