This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:09 (UTC).

Robert Gipson v. Dassault Falcon Jet Corp

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Robert Gipson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dassault Falcon Jet Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2475

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Robert Gipson

Defendant / Appellee

Dassault Falcon Jet Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lucien Ramseur Gillham

Attorney at SUTTER & GILLHAM

P.O. Box 2012

Benton, AR 72018-2012

Luther Oneal Sutter

Attorney at SUTTER & GILLHAM

P.O. Box 2012

Benton, AR 72018-2012

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian A. Vandiver

Attorney at COX & STERLING

8712 Counts Massie Road

North Little Rock, AR 72113

 

Court Documents

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/29/2019 [4813341] [19-2475] (LOS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:35 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/25/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Lucien Ramseur Gillham for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 08/26/2019. [4823454] [19-2475]--[Edited to revise request date 08/27/2019 by HAG] (LRG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:24 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, opinion and order dated 06/12/2019, judgment dated 06/12/2019[4808261] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/26/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Robert Gipson due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808263] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Luther Sutter for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 07/16/2019 [4808676] [19-2475] (LOS) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:01 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4823454-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Lucien Ramseur Gillham. Brief of Robert Gipson due 09/25/2019. Appendix due on 09/25/2019. [4823962] [19-2475] (HAG) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Lucien R. Gillham for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 07/16/2019 [4808679] [19-2475] (LRG) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4808242] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brian A. Vandiver for Appellee Dassault Falcon Jet Corp w/service 07/16/2019 [4808696] [19-2475] (BAV) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4823454-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Lucien Ramseur Gillham. Brief of Robert Gipson due 09/25/2019. Appendix due on 09/25/2019. [4823962] [19-2475] (HAG) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/25/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Lucien Ramseur Gillham for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 08/26/2019. [4823454] [19-2475]--[Edited to revise request date 08/27/2019 by HAG] (LRG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/29/2019 [4813341] [19-2475] (LOS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-2475: paid - cs] [4811293] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Brian A. Vandiver for Appellee Dassault Falcon Jet Corp w/service 07/16/2019 [4808696] [19-2475] (BAV) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Lucien R. Gillham for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 07/16/2019 [4808679] [19-2475] (LRG) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Luther Sutter for Appellant Mr. Robert Gipson w/service 07/16/2019 [4808676] [19-2475] (LOS) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/26/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Robert Gipson due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808263] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, opinion and order dated 06/12/2019, judgment dated 06/12/2019[4808261] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4808242] [19-2475] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.