This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2020 at 06:06:33 (UTC).

Robert Frost v. Dept of Rehabilitation & Corr, et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Robert Frost filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dept of Rehabilitation Corr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4146

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEPARTMENT OF REHABILITATION AND CORRECTION, in its official capacity

TEARA S. MCGEE-EDWARDS, Correctional officer, Allen Correctional Institution, in her official and individual capacity

MAJOR BENDROSS, Chief of Security, Allen Correctional Institution, in his official and individual capacity

HUMPHREY

LIEUTENANT BRILEY, R.I.B. Chairman, Allen Correctional Institution, in his official and individual capacity

T. WRIGHT, Administrative Segregation, Allen Correctional Institution, in his individual and official capacity

JANE DOE DYER, Administrative Segregation Housing Unit, Allen Correctional Institution, in her individual and official capacity

SHERRI SCHNIPKE, Institutional Inspector, Allen Correctional Institution, in her individual and official capacity

JOHN DOE WAGNER, Correctional officer, Allen Correctional Institution, in his official and individual capacity

JOHN DOE YOUNG, Unit manager, Allen Correctional Institution, in his official and individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT FROST

London, OH 43140

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lori Hackney Duckworth

Attorney at United States District Court

85 Marconi Boulevard, Room 208

Columbus, OH 43215-2835

Lori Duckworth

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

150 E. Gay Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Frost

Attorney at London Correctional Institution

P.O. Box 69

London, OH 43140

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

4 #1

Briefing Letter

4 #2

form(s) sent

#5

#6

#7

#8

9 #1

Letter

9 #2

form(s) sent

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER SENT to Mr. Robert Frost, regarding motion to extend time to file brief. (ASM) [Entered: 12/10/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Robert Frost to extend time to file brief. Certificate of service: 12/07/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 12/10/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert Frost Certificate of Service:11/14/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Robert Frost for appointment of counsel. Certificate of service: 11/24/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Major Bendross, Briley, Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Jane Doe Dyer, Teara S. McGee-Edwards, Sherri Schnipke, John Doe Wagner, T. Wright and Mr. John Doe Young by Lori H. Duckworth. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2020. [20-4146] (LD) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/10/2020, appellee brief due 01/12/2021. (ASM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Copy of District Court Order filed 10/27/2020, RE #18 granting in forma pauperis. (ASM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Frost. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Humphrey is a litigant