This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/03/2022 at 06:08:36 (UTC).

Robert, et al v. Austin, et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Robert, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Austin,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1032

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

DAN ROBERT, SSGT, U.S. Army

HOLLIE MULVIHILL, SSGT, USMC and other similarly situated individuals

Defendant / Appellees

LLOYD J. AUSTIN, in his official capacity as Secretary of Defense, U.S. Department of Defense

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

JANET WOODCOCK, in her official capacity as Acting Commissioner of the U.S. Food and Drug Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Schlafly

939 Old Chester Road

Far Hills, NJ 07931-0000

Todd Samson Callender

Attorney at Disabled Rights Advocates

600 17Th Street, Suite 2800 South

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Carroll

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Room 7712

Washington, DC 20530

Sarah Jane Clark

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Marleigh Dover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Room 7712

Washington, DC 20530

Casen Ross

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Room 7712

Washington, DC 20530

Charles W. Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Room 7712

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10890512] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Marleigh Dover and Sarah Carroll for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/03/2022 08:55 AM]

Open Document

[10890531] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Charles W. Scarborough and Mr. Casen Ross for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:19 AM]

Open Document

[10892606] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Schlafly for Dan Robert and Hollie Mulvihill. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/13/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/14/2022 07:36 AM]

Open Document

[10892901] Notice that a transcript is not necessary filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on: 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by LG to correct event code] TSC [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:32 PM]

Open Document

[10892902] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Todd Samson Callender for Dan Robert and Hollie Mulvihill. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:36 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10893213] Docketing statement filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 02/15/2022 08:03 PM]

Open Document

[10902137] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on 03/28/2022 by email. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 8117. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 03/28/2022 12:33 PM]

Open Document

[10902151] Appellant's appendix filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 03/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:03 PM]

Open Document

[10902164] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah Jane Clark for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/28/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:29 PM]

Open Document

[10903118] Motion filed by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra and Janet Woodcock to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 05/27/2022. Served on: 03/31/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] SJC [Entered: 03/31/2022 10:11 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket[10903176] Paper copies of appellants' brief and appendix received from Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. [22-1032] [Entered: 03/31/2022 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket[10903122] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - granting appellees unopposed motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellees brief now due 05/27/2022 for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 03/31/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-1032] [Entered: 03/31/2022 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10903118] Motion filed by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra and Janet Woodcock to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 05/27/2022. Served on: 03/31/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] SJC [Entered: 03/31/2022 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10902164] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah Jane Clark for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/28/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket[10902158] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah J. Clark for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra and Janet Woodcock for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032]--[Edited 03/28/2022 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 3/28/2022] SJC [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket[10902155] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellants is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Appellees' brief now due 04/27/2022 for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. Paper copies of appellants brief and appendix due 04/04/2022 by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-1032] [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10902151] Appellant's appendix filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 03/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10902137] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on 03/28/2022 by email. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 8117. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 03/28/2022 12:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket[10895762] Attorney Mr. Todd Samson Callender for Dan Robert and Hollie Mulvihill admitted to the bar of this court. [22-1032] [Entered: 02/28/2022 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10893213] Docketing statement filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032] AS [Entered: 02/15/2022 08:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892902] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Todd Samson Callender for Dan Robert and Hollie Mulvihill. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892901] Notice that a transcript is not necessary filed by Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Served on: 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by LG to correct event code] TSC [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket[10892899] Entry of appearance submitted by Todd S. Callender for Appellants Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/14/2022 by NA] TSC [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10892606] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Schlafly for Dan Robert and Hollie Mulvihill. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/13/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/14/2022 07:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2022
  • Docket[10892589] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew L. Schlafly for Appellants Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/13/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/14/2022 by NA] AS [Entered: 02/13/2022 08:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10890531] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Charles W. Scarborough and Mr. Casen Ross for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket[10890528] Entry of appearance submitted by Casen B. Ross; Charles W. Scarborough for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra and Janet Woodcock for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/3/2022] CR [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10890512] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Marleigh Dover and Sarah Carroll for Janet Woodcock, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1032] [Entered: 02/03/2022 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket[10890503] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah Carroll, Marleigh D. Dover for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra and Janet Woodcock for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1032] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/03/2022 by NA] SC [Entered: 02/03/2022 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10890199] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/02/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due 02/16/2022 for Hollie Mulvihill and Dan Robert. Notice of appearance due on 02/16/2022 for Lloyd J. Austin, Xavier Becerra, and Janet Woodcock [22-1032] [Entered: 02/02/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Jane Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marleigh D. Dover

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Carroll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casen Ross