This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/31/2022 at 06:10:20 (UTC).

Robert Espinoza v. Union of American Physicians and Dentists, AFSCME, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Robert Espinoza filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Union of American Physicians and Dentists, AFSCME. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55331

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT ESPINOZA

Defendant / Appellees

UNION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS AND DENTISTS, AFSCME LOCAL 206

CALIFORNIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES

BETTY T. YEE, in her official capacity as California State Controller

ROB BONTA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Shella Sadovnik Alcabes

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Timothy R. Snowball

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Andrew Hanley

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

David A. Rosenfeld

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

1375 55Th Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Anne I. Yen

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

1375 55Th Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Anthony Paul O'Brien Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Espinoza Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/06/2022. [12414396] [22-55331] (Snowball, Timothy) [Entered: 04/06/2022 04:25 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12432261] (BLS) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:31 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12432261] (BLS) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/06/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12414502]. [22-55331] (AD) [Entered: 04/06/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Espinoza Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/06/2022. [12414396] [22-55331] (Snowball, Timothy) [Entered: 04/06/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Meant for case 22-55332. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. [12410975] (RT) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Robert Espinoza Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/08/2022. Appellant Robert Espinoza opening brief due 06/02/2022. Appellees Rob Bonta, California Correctional Healthcare Services, Union of American Physicians and Dentists, AFSCME Local 206 and Betty T. Yee answering brief due 07/05/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12410886] (RT) [Entered: 04/01/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE SERV- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne Iwa Yen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Paul O'Brien Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Kronland