This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 06:20:09 (UTC).

Robert Doucette, et al v. USDOI, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Robert Doucette filed an Other lawsuit against USDOI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35269

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SATURNINO JAVIER

TRESEA DOUCETTE

BERNADINE ROBERTS

ROBERT DOUCETTE

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN TAHSUDA, Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary - Indian Affairs, in his official capacity

TARA SWEENEY, Assistant Secretary - Indian Affairs, in her official capacity

DAVID BERNHARDT, Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Interior, in his official capacity

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gabriel S. Galanda

P.O. Box 14156

Seattle, WA 98115

Anthony Stephen Broadman Esquire

Attorney at Galanda Broadman

P.O. Box 14156

Seattle, WA 98115

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian Kipnis

Attorney at DOJ-Office of the U.S. Attorney

700 Stewart Street

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette, Saturnino Javier and Bernadine Roberts in 19-35743, 20-35269. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11699371] [19-35743, 20-35269] (Broadman, Anthony) [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:10 PM]

#3

(#3) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette and Saturnino Javier in 19-35743, 20-35269. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11699359] [19-35743, 20-35269] (Broadman, Anthony) [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:08 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): These appeals are consolidated. The schedule previously set for appeal no. 20-35269 will govern the consolidated appeal. The parties are requested to discuss this courts jurisdiction over appeal no. 20-35269 in their briefs. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. [11646870] [19-35743, 20-35269] (SB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 10:24 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette, Saturnino Javier and Bernadine Roberts in 19-35743, 20-35269. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11699371] [19-35743, 20-35269] (Broadman, Anthony) [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette and Saturnino Javier in 19-35743, 20-35269. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11699359] [19-35743, 20-35269] (Broadman, Anthony) [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): These appeals are consolidated. The schedule previously set for appeal no. 20-35269 will govern the consolidated appeal. The parties are requested to discuss this courts jurisdiction over appeal no. 20-35269 in their briefs. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. [11646870] [19-35743, 20-35269] (SB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette, Saturnino Javier and Bernadine Roberts Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/31/2020. Appellants Robert Doucette, Tresea Doucette, Saturnino Javier and Bernadine Roberts opening brief due 05/22/2020. Appellees David Bernhardt, Tara Sweeney, John Tahsuda and U.S. Department of the Interior answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11639984] (JBS) [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Kipnis