This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/17/2020 at 06:12:01 (UTC).

Robert Cohen v. Conagra Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Robert Cohen filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Conagra Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55969

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT COHEN, a consumer, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marc Lawrence Godino Esquire

Attorney at GLANCY BINKOW & GOLDBERG, LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kathleen A. Herkenhoff

Attorney at Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway, Suite 2050

San Diego, CA 92101

Gretchen Elsner

Attorney at Elsner Law & Policy, LLC

314 S. Guadalupe Street

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rachel E. K. Lowe

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Angela M. Spivey

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Robert Cohen to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Robert Cohen opening brief due 12/17/2020. Appellee Conagra Brands, Inc. answering brief due 01/19/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11891878] (JN) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Robert Cohen. New requested due date is 12/17/2020. [11891645] [20-55969] (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11876122] (BLS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Cohen Correspondence: A conformed copy of the Transcript Designation Form filed with the district court is attached.. Date of service: 10/01/2020 [11844579] [20-55969] (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/28/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11838869] (BLS) [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11833560]. [20-55969] (AD) [Entered: 09/22/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Cohen Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/22/2020. [11833348] [20-55969] (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) [Entered: 09/22/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Robert Cohen Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/25/2020. Appellant Robert Cohen opening brief due 11/17/2020. Appellee Conagra Brands, Inc. answering brief due 12/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11829543] (JBS) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT COHEN ON BEHALF OF COHEN KIDS LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel E K Lowe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Margarite Spivey