This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/09/2020 at 06:20:44 (UTC).

Robert Brown, Sr. v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Robert Brown, Sr filed an Other lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1137

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ROBERT WILLIAM BROWN, SR.

Calabassa, CA 91302

Debtor

In re: ROBERT WILLIAM BROWN, SR.

Appellees

ELIZABETH F. ROJAS

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Certificate Holders Cwalt, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-22 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-22

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Robert William Brown Sr.

4465 Alta Tupelo Dr.

Calabassa, CA 91302

Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth F. Rojas

Attorney at Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee

15260 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

W. Jason Scott Esquire

801 K Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

3 #1

Opening Letter

3 #2

form(s) sent

#3

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

#4

5 #1

Copy: 2nd Request for Lis Pendens Pending Outcome of Appeal

5 #2

Envelope Document Copy Was In

#6

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Certificate of Mailing

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BAP Mandate Issued. Notice of entry of judgment to Bankruptcy Clerk. (PI) [Entered: 07/31/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLOSED: Case closed: Rule 8023;Procedural termination after other judicial action; Gan, Faris and Lafferty. (PI) [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Gan, Faris and Lafferty) The appeal is ORDERED DISMISSED. All other relief requested is ORDERED DENIED. See attached order for details. ; [EOD] Date: 07/31/2020. (PI) [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY UPDATED. Docketed in wrong case. --[Edited 07/22/2020 by PI] (PI) [Entered: 07/22/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received from Appellant Robert William Brown, Sr. - COPY 2nd Request for Lis Pendens Pending Outcome of Appeal. (Note: Original document was filed at the 9th Cir. U.S. Court of Appeals on 07/09/2020 - CA# 20-55218 / CA Docket Entry #13.) (VB) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Party Robert William Brown, Sr.'s withdrawl of appeal. ; served on 06/24/2020. (PI) [Entered: 07/02/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: CC-20-1137. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 06/19/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order ( Clerk: sms) ; No later than Tuesday, June 30, 2020, Mr. Brown must file a statement in writing explaining what order he is appealing.; dated: 06/16/2020.( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 06/03/2020. (PI) [Entered: 06/12/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant