This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/21/2020 at 06:20:12 (UTC).

Robert Briseno, et al v. ConAgra Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Robert Briseno filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against ConAgra Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55068

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Appellant

M. TODD HENDERSON

Plaintiff / Appellees

KELLY MCFADDEN

PATTY BOYER

DEE HOPPER-KERCHEVAL

ERIKA HEINS

LIL MARIE-BIRR, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

MICHELE ANDRADE

LEONORA ULITSKY

JILL CROUCH

JULIE PALMER

PAULINE MICHAEL

ANITA WILLMAN

RONA JOHNSTON

BRENDA KREIN

MAUREEN TOWEY

ALEXIS JUSTAK

JANETH RUIZ

NECLA MUSAT

CHRISTI TOOMER

Defendant / Appellee

CONAGRA FOODS, INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Theodore H. Frank

Attorney at Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam J. Levitt Esquire

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Eleventh Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Andrei V. Rado

Attorney at Milberg LLP

1 Pennsylvania Plaza

New York, NY 10119

Christian J. Keeney

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart

695 Town Center Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

David E. Azar

Attorney at Milberg LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3149

Amy E. Keller

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Eleventh Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Henry Kelston

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, P.C.

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Angela M. Spivey

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11603337] (CL) [Entered: 02/20/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 02/20/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11588737] (CL) [Entered: 02/06/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/27/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11575194]. [20-55068] (AD) [Entered: 01/27/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant M. Todd Henderson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/27/2020. [11575037] [20-55068] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 01/27/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant M. Todd Henderson Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/28/2020. Transcript ordered by 02/18/2020. Transcript due 03/18/2020. Appellant M. Todd Henderson opening brief due 04/27/2020. Appellees Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky and Anita Willman answering brief due 05/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11569149] (RT) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Margarite Spivey