This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/13/2020 at 05:08:50 (UTC).

Robert Barboza v. BNSF Railway Company, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Robert Barboza filed an Other lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70363

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT A. BARBOZA

Mission Viejo, CA 92692

Respondents

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

GILLIAN DALE, Esquire

Denver, CO 80202

KEITH GOMAN

Denver, CO 80202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert A. Barboza

25352 Misty Ridge

Mission Viejo, CA 92692

Respondent Attorneys

Paul S. Balanon

Attorney at BNSF Railway Company Law Dept.

2500 Lou Menk Drive, Aob-3

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Edward Dean Sieger Esquire

Attorney at LABR - U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20210

Gillian Dale

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Keith Goman

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Petition for Review

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Petitioner Robert A. Barboza FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/06/2020. [11593997] (RL) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE PETITIONER. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: No. Petitioner brief due 04/30/2020 for Robert A. Barboza. Respondent brief due 06/01/2020 for BNSF Railway Company, Gillian Dale, Keith Goman and U.S. Department of Labor. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11592675][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/12/2020 by BY] (JMR) [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less