This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2019 at 06:04:27 (UTC).

Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Securit

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Rivera filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Securit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1021

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff / Appellant

Rosa Maria Rivera

Bronx, NY 10451

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Amanda Frances Parsels Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rosa Maria Rivera

291 East 143Rd Street

Bronx, NY 10451

 

Court Documents

#23

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

11 #2

Certificate of Service

11 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 05/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/24/2019, unless Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2554961] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:46 AM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 05/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/24/2019, unless Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2554926] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:31 AM]

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER, [ # 8 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera failure to file form D-P, EFFECTIVE. [2576237] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2576232] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED.[2565919] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ATTORNEY, Amanda Frances Parsels for Commissioner of Social Security Administration, in case 19-1021 , [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2565917] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2565866] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [12], on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED.[2559378] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2559354] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2559131] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 05/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/24/2019, unless Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2554961] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE, to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2554952] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, dated 05/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/24/2019, unless Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2554926] [19-1021] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2543042] [19-1021] [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2543039] [19-1021] [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2543037] [19-1021] [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rosa Maria Rivera, FILED. [2543034] [19-1021] [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.