Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Rita Murchison, et al v. Reliance Standard Life Ins Co

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Rita Murchison filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5700

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellees

BRANDY CRAWFORD

RITA MURCHISON

JOSHUA MURCHISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James M. Burd

Attorney at Wilson Elser

100 Mallard Creek Road, Suite 250

Louisville, KY 40207

Joshua Bachrach

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

Independence Square W., Suite 1130 East, The Curtis Center

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Edward Michael O'Brien

Attorney at Wilson Elser

100 Mallard Creek Road, Suite 250

Louisville, KY 40207

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Michael James Hoover

Attorney at Interpleader Law

9015 Bluebonnet Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Stipulation to Dismiss

16 #1

Mediator letter sent

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edward Michael O'Brien for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:41 AM]

#14

(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Edward Michael O'Brien for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Certificate of Service:07/09/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:40 AM]

13 #2

Additional Document

13 #1

civil appeal statement of parties and issues

#12

(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/14/2020. appellee brief now due 09/14/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:03 PM]

#11

(#11) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 07/31/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:01 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by Joshua Bachrach. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (JB) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:45 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by James M. Burd. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (JMB) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:19 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by Edward M. O'Brien. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:11 AM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Michael James Hoover for Appellees Brandy Crawford, Joshua Murchison and Rita Murchison Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-5700] (MJH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:40 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brandy Crawford, Joshua Murchison and Rita Murchison by Michael J. Hoover. [20-5700] (MJH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:38 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:22 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/04/2020; appellee brief due 09/03/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:15 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:06 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 08/31/2020. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edward Michael O'Brien for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Edward Michael O'Brien for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Certificate of Service:07/09/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Edward Michael O'Brien for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Certificate of Service:07/09/2020. [20-5700]- Corporate Disclosure Statement attached must be filed separately.--[Edited 07/09/2020 by SSS]--[Edited 07/09/2020 by SSS] (EMO) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/14/2020. appellee brief now due 09/14/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 07/31/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by Joshua Bachrach. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (JB) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by James M. Burd. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (JMB) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company by Edward M. O'Brien. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5700] (EMO) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Michael James Hoover for Appellees Brandy Crawford, Joshua Murchison and Rita Murchison Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-5700] (MJH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brandy Crawford, Joshua Murchison and Rita Murchison by Michael J. Hoover. [20-5700] (MJH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/04/2020; appellee brief due 09/03/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael James Hoover