This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/02/2020 at 06:16:32 (UTC).

Rita Meeks v. Robert Newcomb, et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Rita Meeks filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Robert Newcomb. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11325

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT LYNN NEWCOMB

CELADON TRUCKING

Plaintiff / Appellant

RITA MEEKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John D. Dixon

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP

900 Cir 75 Pkwy Ste 1400

Atlanta, GA 30339

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Evan Cook

Attorney at Cook Law Group, LLC

Po Box 2415

Gainesville, GA 30503

John Hamilton Peavy Jr.

Attorney at Peavy Law, LLC

563 Spring St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30308

Kate S. Cook

Attorney at Cook Law Group, LLC

Po Box 2415

Gainesville, GA 30503

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Robert Lynn Newcomb [20-11325] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:21 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Rita Meeks [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:35 AM]

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix Vol 2 Filed

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Vol 1 Filed

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:21 AM]

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John D. Dixon for Appellee Robert Lynn Newcomb. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11325] (Correct Attorney Name. per Atty)--[Edited 05/01/2020 by WP] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 05/01/2020 11:39 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Rita Meeks. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:19 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 04/17/2020 10:24 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:51 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:50 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:48 AM]

Open Document #3

John Peavy for Rita Meeks

Open Document #2

Matthew Cook for Rita Meeks

Open Document #1

Kate Cook for Rita Meeks

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John D. Dixon for Celadon Trucking and Robert Lynn Newcomb. [20-11325] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:08 AM]

Open Document #4

District Court Judgment, DE # 222

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Robert Lynn Newcomb [20-11325] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Rita Meeks. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Rita Meeks. [Entered: 05/19/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Rita Meeks [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellant Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Rita Meeks. [Entered: 05/07/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketRemoved from case: Attorney John D. Dixon for Appellee Celadon Trucking in 20-11325. [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John D. Dixon for Appellee Robert Lynn Newcomb. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11325] (Correct Attorney Name. per Atty)--[Edited 05/01/2020 by WP] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 05/01/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Rita Meeks. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 04/17/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kate S. Cook for Appellant Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kate S. Cook for Rita Meeks, Matthew Evan Cook for Rita Meeks and John Hamilton Peavy, Jr. for Rita Meeks. [20-11325] (ECF: Kate Cook) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John D. Dixon for Celadon Trucking and Robert Lynn Newcomb. [20-11325] (ECF: John Dixon) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Rita Meeks on 04/03/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/17/2020 as to Appellant Rita Meeks. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/01/2020 as to Appellee Robert Lynn Newcomb [Entered: 04/09/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Hamilton Peavy, Jr.(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATE S COOK