This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/17/2023 at 06:07:24 (UTC).

Rita Franklin v. Dominion Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Rita Franklin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dominion Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2183

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RITA RENE THOMAS FRANKLIN

Joint Air Base Andrews, MD 20762

Defendant / Appellees

DOMINION ENERGY, INC.

PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY OF NORTH CAROLINA, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Dominion Energy North Carolina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rita Rene Thomas Franklin

5187 Bennett Court

Joint Air Base Andrews, MD 20762

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Melissa O. Martinez Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

500 East Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001268226] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/18/2022 08:56 AM]

2 #1

Informal Briefing Order

#2

Disclosure Statement

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001268233]. Due: 12/02/2022. [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/18/2022 09:03 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa O. Martinez for Dominion Energy, Inc.. [1001276515] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:38 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa O. Martinez for Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated. [1001276528] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:46 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dominion Energy, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001276530] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:47 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001276531] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:48 PM]

#9

RESTRICTED

10 #1

10 #2

42B Motion

#11

(#11) Corrected MOTION by Rita Rene Thomas Franklin Motion to Withdrawl reserving right to refile. to withdraw Appellant withdraws Appeal at this time but reserves the right to refile with expanded evidence.. petition for rehearing Appellant is Withdrawing prior to informal brief being filed by either party as new complaint is needed based on evidence... Date and method of service: 12/09/2022 US mail, ecf. [1001280293] [22-2183] Rita Franklin [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:35 PM]

#12

(#12) NOTICE ISSUED to Dominion Energy, Inc. and Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated requesting response to Motion to withdraw [ # 11 ]. Response due 12/19/2022.[1001280341].. [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:16 PM]

#13

(#13) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Dominion Energy, Inc. and Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated to [ # 12 ]. [1001285218] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:18 AM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [14]; administratively terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001285286] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:58 AM]

#15

(#15) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00361-TDC.. [1001285288] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:59 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00361-TDC.. [1001285288] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [14]; administratively terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001285286] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Dominion Energy, Inc. and Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated to [ # 12 ]. [1001285218] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE ISSUED to Dominion Energy, Inc. and Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated requesting response to Motion to withdraw [ # 11 ]. Response due 12/19/2022.[1001280341].. [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected MOTION by Rita Rene Thomas Franklin Motion to Withdrawl reserving right to refile. to withdraw Appellant withdraws Appeal at this time but reserves the right to refile with expanded evidence.. petition for rehearing Appellant is Withdrawing prior to informal brief being filed by either party as new complaint is needed based on evidence... Date and method of service: 12/09/2022 US mail, ecf. [1001280293] [22-2183] Rita Franklin [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket correction requested from Rita Rene Thomas Franklin. Re: [ # 9 ] no brief Notice. Access to no brief Notice has been restricted to case participants. [1001280211] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) NOTICE by Rita Rene Thomas Franklin that no brief will be filed. [1001280201] [22-2183]--[Edited 12/09/2022 by RP-corrected at ECF #11] Rita Franklin [Entered: 12/09/2022 11:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001276531] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dominion Energy, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001276530] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa O. Martinez for Public Service Company of North Carolina, Incorporated. [1001276528] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa O. Martinez for Dominion Energy, Inc.. [1001276515] [22-2183] Melissa Martinez [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00361-TDC. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001269672] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/21/2022 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001268233]. Due: 12/02/2022. [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/18/2022 09:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Rita Rene Franklin and Chauna Abner. [1001268230] Informal Opening Brief due 12/12/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/18/2022 09:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001268226] [22-2183] RP [Entered: 11/18/2022 08:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less