This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:36:21 (UTC).

Rigoberto Mejia-Chay v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Rigoberto Mejia-Chay filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70390

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIGOBERTO MEJIA-CHAY

Los Angeles, CA 90057

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rigoberto Mejia-Chay

840 South Grand View Street, #309

Los Angeles, CA 90057

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #4

Petition for Review and Request for Stay of Removal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Petitioner Rigoberto Mejia-Chay motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/10/2020. [11596766][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/14/2020 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. PRO SE. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? Unknown. Certified Administrative Record due 03/19/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/09/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Rigoberto Mejia-Chay. Respondent brief due 07/17/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. (Motion for IFP within petition) [11596762][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/14/2020 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.