This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/12/2022 at 06:07:59 (UTC).

Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Cengage Learning, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cengage Learning, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1468

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RIGGS TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Peterson Ramey III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Boulevard

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831799] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:21 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831800] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:22 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831801] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:25 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC, Entry of Appearance, Docketing Statement, Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/25/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [831944] [ALK] [Entered: 02/17/2022 11:35 AM]

#6

(#6) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832110] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:01 PM]

#7

(#7) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832113] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:02 PM]

#8

(#8) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832116] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:03 PM]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for Ricardo J. Bonilla; Neil J. McNabnay as counsel for Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832590] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:34 PM]

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832591] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:36 PM]

#11

(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832592] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:37 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket(#12) Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 22-1468 and 22-1469. [832737] [ALK] [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832592] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832591] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Ricardo J. Bonilla; Neil J. McNabnay as counsel for Appellee Cengage Learning, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2022 by email. [832590] [22-1468] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832116] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832113] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/17/2022 by email. [832110] [22-1468] [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/17/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC, Entry of Appearance, Docketing Statement, Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/25/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [831944] [ALK] [Entered: 02/17/2022 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831801] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831800] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/16/2022 by email. [831799] [22-1468] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [William Ramey] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/09/2022. [830722] Entry of Appearance due 02/25/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/25/2022. Docketing Statement due 02/25/2022. Appellant's brief is due 04/12/2022. [MMA] [Entered: 02/11/2022 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cengage Learning, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Joel Bonilla