This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:58 (UTC).

Ricky Fowler v. Manuel Fields, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Ricky Fowler filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Manuel Fields. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20500

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MANUEL FIELDS

DAVID AND IVORY MINISTRIES, INCORPORATED

DONNA ROASONOVER

DONNA REASONOVER

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICKY DEAN FOWLER

Huntsville, TX 77320-3320

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ricky Dean Fowler

Attorney at CID Estelle Unit

264 Fm 3478

Huntsville, TX 77320-3320

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102671-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (LLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:44 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #3

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler in support of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA (INCORPORATED WITHIN THE MOTION FOR IFP) [ # 9109246-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/24/2019. [9109258-1] [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:42 PM]

Open Document #1

Unfiled Petition for Review

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Donna Roasonover in 19-20500 substituted by Appellee Donna Reasonover in 19-20500 [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (LLL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document #2

Unfiled Exhibits in Support

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • The Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler in 19-20500 [ # 9109246-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Petition for Review, which is view as a brief on the merits of the appeal, together with exhibits in support received from Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler because same is premature at this time [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20500] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Donna Roasonover in 19-20500 substituted by Appellee Donna Reasonover in 19-20500 [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-CV-2215. Electronic ROA due on 08/14/2019. [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case. Fee due on 08/29/2019 for Appellant Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler in support of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA (INCORPORATED WITHIN THE MOTION FOR IFP) [ # 9109246-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/24/2019. [9109258-1] [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) [9109246-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 07/24/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: Needs a trust fund statement Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 08/09/2019 for Appellant Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (DLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102671-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (LLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Dean Fowler [19-20500] (LLL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.