This case was last updated from PACER on 02/06/2021 at 06:10:29 (UTC).

Ricky Ashley v. Ruth Ginsburg, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Ricky Ashley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ruth Ginsburg. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3558

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Does, All Active U.S. District Court Judges, Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas

Jane Kelly, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Sonia Sotomayor, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Samuel A. Alito, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Elena Kagan, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Duane Benton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

J Thomas Ray, United States Magistrate Judge

Ralph R. Erickson, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Gary M. Arnold, Saline County Circuit Judge

Neil M. Gorsuch, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Brett M. Kavanaugh, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Lavenski R. Smith, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Raymond W. Gruender, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky, United States District Judge

Steven M. Colloton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Stephen G. Breyer, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Jonathan A. Kobes, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

James B. Loken, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge

Clarence Thomas, U.S. Supreme Court Justice

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ricky Ashley

Tucker, AR 72168

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ricky Ashley

Attorney at ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION

2501 State Farm Road

Tucker, AR 72168

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Motion for transfer any other appellate court and objections to clerk order

Open Document

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Miscellaneous district court documents

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Motion for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a)

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Ricky Ashley due 02/03/2021. [4996048] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 01/20/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Appellant's motion for summary judgment [ # 4987272-2 ], the motion for transfer to any other appellate court of competent jurisdiction [ # 4989887-3 ] are hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4996047] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 01/20/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for transfer to any other appellate court of competent jurisdiction, And RESPONSE in objection to clerk order case proceeding on of (need file) , [ # 4983319-2 ], issued on 12/8/2020 requesting original file of district court filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley w/service 12/30/2020. [4989887] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent regarding to Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley regarding using the correct caption and acase number on all future filing with this court. [4987281] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for entry of Summary Judgment.under Rule 56(a), filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley in 20-3544, 20-3558 w/service 12/21/2020. [4987272] [20-3544, 20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT FILED - copies of miscellaneous district court documents filed by Mr. Ricky Ashley w/service 12/18/2020. [4986361] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4983319] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 01/07/2021. [4983317] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 12/7/2020. [4983313] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [4983309] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricky Ashley