This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/30/2020 at 07:17:20 (UTC).

Rick Parsittie v. Schneider Logistics, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Rick Parsittie filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Schneider Logistics, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55470

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Defendant

CONNECT STAFFING, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION, INC.

SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS, INC.

SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANS-LOADING AND DISTRIBUTION, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICK PARSITTIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sylvia Kim

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sabrina Alexis Beldner Esquire

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Kane

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11728118] (BLS) [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Status Report by Appellees due 6/3/2020. Status Report by Appellant due 6/17/2020. DIAL-IN Conference, 06/19/2020, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11697950] (BLS) [Entered: 05/21/2020 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/20/2020,11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11690957] (BLS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/08/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11685720]. [20-55470] (AD) [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Rick Parsittie Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/08/2020. [11685161] [20-55470] (Setareh, Chaim) [Entered: 05/08/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Rick Parsittie Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 05/28/2020. Transcript due 06/29/2020. Appellant Rick Parsittie opening brief due 08/10/2020. Appellees Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics Trans-Loading and Distribution, Inc. and Schneider Logistics, Inc. answering brief due 09/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11677654] (RT) [Entered: 05/01/2020 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS INC is a litigant