This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/11/2021 at 05:22:38 (UTC).

Richmond v. US

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Richmond filed an Other lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-125

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondents

CARL WARNER

JOSEPH AUGUSTA

CHARLES PINNIZZOTTO

JASON DIGNAN

KIMBERLY BUSH

MICHAEL CRUZ

ADAM SMITH

JASON KARLHEIM

BRYAN BOWER

WILLIAM ADAMS

LEONEL HERNANDEZ

JESSE CARTER

BRIAN MUELLER

KEVIN J. SHEEHAN

CHRIS BARRETT

KELLY BUTTERBAUGH

BOBBY MARBURGER

THOMAS MOORE

CHRISTOPHER GRAFTON

JAMES KIRKLAND

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Jack K. Whitehead Jr.

Attorney at Whitehead Law Firm

11909 Bricksome Avenue, Suite W-3

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Other Attorneys

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Sean Janda; Mark B. Stern; Michael Shih as counsel for Petitioner US. Service: 03/09/2021 by email. [761227] [21-125] [Sean Janda] [Entered: 03/09/2021 04:15 PM]

#2

(#2) PETITION of Petitioner US for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b), Fed. R. App. P. 5. Service: 03/08/2021 by email. [761136] [LMN] [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:51 PM]

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received:. [761132] Entry of Appearance due 03/23/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/23/2021. [LMN] [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:48 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER consolidating appeals; The above-captioned petitions for interlocutory appeal are consolidated, and one set of briefing should be filed. The revised official caption is reflected above. Respondents are directed to respond to the petitions [ # 760279-2 ] [ # 761052-2 ] [ # 761124-2 ] [ # 761147-2 ] [ # 2 ] [ # 761145-2 ] [ # 761156-2 ] [ # 761168-2 ] [ # 761264-2 ] no later than 7 days from the date of filing of this order, including Respondents to Appeal No. 2021-119. Any reply in support of the petitions is due no later than 3 days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [761270] [21-119, 21-122, 21-123, 21-124, 21-125, 21-126, 21-127, 21-128, 21-129] [LMS] [Entered: 03/09/2021 05:54 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-119 (Lead) with 21-122, -123, -124, -125, -126, -127, -128, -129 (Member Cases). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [761433] [21-119, 21-122, 21-123, 21-124, 21-125, 21-126, 21-127, 21-128, 21-129] [MMA] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER consolidating appeals; The above-captioned petitions for interlocutory appeal are consolidated, and one set of briefing should be filed. The revised official caption is reflected above. Respondents are directed to respond to the petitions [ # 760279-2 ] [ # 761052-2 ] [ # 761124-2 ] [ # 761147-2 ] [ # 2 ] [ # 761145-2 ] [ # 761156-2 ] [ # 761168-2 ] [ # 761264-2 ] no later than 7 days from the date of filing of this order, including Respondents to Appeal No. 2021-119. Any reply in support of the petitions is due no later than 3 days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [761270] [21-119, 21-122, 21-123, 21-124, 21-125, 21-126, 21-127, 21-128, 21-129] [LMS] [Entered: 03/09/2021 05:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Sean Janda; Mark B. Stern; Michael Shih as counsel for Petitioner US. Service: 03/09/2021 by email. [761227] [21-125] [Sean Janda] [Entered: 03/09/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner US for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b), Fed. R. App. P. 5. Service: 03/08/2021 by email. [761136] [LMN] [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received:. [761132] Entry of Appearance due 03/23/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/23/2021. [LMN] [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less