This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2022 at 06:09:00 (UTC).

Richard Webber v. Armslist, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Richard Webber filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Armslist, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3198

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD WEBBER, as Special Administrator of the Estate of Sara J. Schmidt

Defendant / Appellees

ARMSLIST, LLC

JONATHAN GIBBON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John D. Kimball

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian A. Sutherland

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

Timothy L. Moore

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. MOORE

811 Mason Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Richard Webber. [2] [7202500] [21-3198] (Kimball, John) [Entered: 12/01/2021 11:37 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John D. Kimball for Appellant Richard Webber. [3] [7202993] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198] (Kimball, John) [Entered: 12/02/2021 04:20 PM]

4 #1

Motion (all other motions not listed below)

4 #2

Affidavit in Support

#5

(#5) ORDER: On consideration of the Motion for Consolidation and Extension of Time to File Opening Brief filed in both appeals. The motion is GRANTED, and these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. [ # 4 ] [ # 4 ] The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/10/2022 for Richard Webber, Erin Bauer and Estate of Paul Bauer. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/11/2022 for Armslist, LLC, Jonathan Gibbon, Broc Elmore and Brian Mancini. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/02/2022 for Appellants Richard Webber, Erin Bauer and Estate of Paul Bauer. DW [5] [7205139] [21-3198, 21-3207] (AD) [Entered: 12/14/2021 12:21 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy Moore [6] [7205665] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198, 21-3207] (Moore, Timothy) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:48 AM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian A. Sutherland for Appellees Armslist, LLC and Jonathan Gibbon in 21-3198, 21-3207. [7] [7208773] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198, 21-3207]--[Edited 01/05/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Sutherland is added to the docket.] (Sutherland, Brian) [Entered: 01/04/2022 05:25 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian A. Sutherland for Appellees Armslist, LLC and Jonathan Gibbon in 21-3198, 21-3207. [7] [7208773] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198, 21-3207]--[Edited 01/05/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Sutherland is added to the docket.] (Sutherland, Brian) [Entered: 01/04/2022 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy Moore [6] [7205665] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198, 21-3207] (Moore, Timothy) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: On consideration of the Motion for Consolidation and Extension of Time to File Opening Brief filed in both appeals. The motion is GRANTED, and these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. [ # 4 ] [ # 4 ] The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/10/2022 for Richard Webber, Erin Bauer and Estate of Paul Bauer. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/11/2022 for Armslist, LLC, Jonathan Gibbon, Broc Elmore and Brian Mancini. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/02/2022 for Appellants Richard Webber, Erin Bauer and Estate of Paul Bauer. DW [5] [7205139] [21-3198, 21-3207] (AD) [Entered: 12/14/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion filed by Appellant Richard Webber to extend time to file appellant brief, and for Consolidation of Appeals. [4] [7204224] [21-3198] (Kimball, John) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John D. Kimball for Appellant Richard Webber. [3] [7202993] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3198] (Kimball, John) [Entered: 12/02/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Richard Webber. [2] [7202500] [21-3198] (Kimball, John) [Entered: 12/01/2021 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/08/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/03/2022 for Richard Webber. [1] [7201655] [21-3198]--[Edited 11/29/2021 by AD to update text.] (AD) [Entered: 11/29/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Armslist LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Moore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Adair Sutherland