Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2020 at 06:06:32 (UTC).

Richard Thuerauf v. United States of America, et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 Richard Thuerauf filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1804

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Ian Lewis, Public Defender

United States of America

U.S. Department of Justice

Office of the Public Defender

Plaintiff / Appellant

Richard Ray Thuerauf

Seagoville, TX 75159-9000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard Ray Thuerauf

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 9000

Seagoville, TX 75159-9000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Petition for Rehearing

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion & Affidavit for Permission to Appeal IFP

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4903785] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:00 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 05/14/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4903784] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order adn Judgment both dated 3/19/2020, and Order dated 4/16/2020. [4903780] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:56 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Prisoner Civil Rights Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION for rehearing by panel filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Ray Thuerauf w/service 06/10/2020 by USCA8 [4922240] [20-1804] (NDW) [Entered: 06/10/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 4907100-2 ] has been considered and is granted. The full $505 appellate and docketing fees are assessed against the appellant. Appellant will be permitted to pay the fee by installment method contained in 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(b)(2). The court remands the calculation of the installments and the collection of the fees to the district court. DUANE BENTON, ROGER L. WOLLMAN and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp May 2020 [4916261] [20-1804] (NDW) [Entered: 05/26/2020 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Duane Benton, Roger L. Wollman, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [4916251] [20-1804] (NDW) [Entered: 05/26/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Ray Thuerauf w/service 04/27/2020. [4907100] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/27/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4903785] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 05/14/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4903784] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order adn Judgment both dated 3/19/2020, and Order dated 4/16/2020. [4903780] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [4903779] [20-1804] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant