This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

Richard Soldan v. Heidi Washington, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Richard Soldan filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Heidi Washington. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2385

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MARIBETH ZELLER, MDOC Hearings Officer

HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, MDOC Director

RUSS MARLAN, Field Operations Deputy Director

MICHAEL EAGEN, Parole Board Chairman

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD SOLDAN

St. Louis, MI 48880

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Raina I. Korbakis

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard Soldan

Attorney at Central Michigan Correctional Facility

320 N. Hubbard Street

St. Louis, MI 48880

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Deficiency notice filed in District Court 12/12/2019, RE #14. Plaintiff is informed that within 28 days from the date of this notice he must submit the $505.00 filing fee or, alternatively, file the required documents to proceed in forma pauperis. (SSS) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:25 PM]

#4

(#4) CORRESPONDENCE: Copy of NOA and Declaration of Inmate Filing. by Richard Soldan. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:51 AM]

#10

(#10) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/26/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:13 AM]

#9

(#9) Copy of District Court Order filed 01/10/2020 granting in forma pauperis, RE #16. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:11 AM]

#12

(#12) LETTER SENT to all parties, regarding cancelling the briefing schedule issued 01/14/2020. In light of counsel appearing on behalf of the defendant's, a new briefing schedule will be issued to include a deadline for the appellee. (SSS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:57 AM]

#5

(#5) TENDERED Motion for Pauper Status. Received from Party Richard Soldan. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:56 PM]

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Richard Soldan. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:37 PM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/05/2020, appellee brief due 04/07/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:08 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michael Eagen, Russ Marlan, Heidi E. Washington and Maribeth Zeller by Raina Korbakis. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [19-2385] (RIK) [Entered: 01/17/2020 05:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/05/2020, appellee brief due 04/07/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER SENT to all parties, regarding cancelling the briefing schedule issued 01/14/2020. In light of counsel appearing on behalf of the defendant's, a new briefing schedule will be issued to include a deadline for the appellee. (SSS) [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michael Eagen, Russ Marlan, Heidi E. Washington and Maribeth Zeller by Raina Korbakis. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [19-2385] (RIK) [Entered: 01/17/2020 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/26/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Copy of District Court Order filed 01/10/2020 granting in forma pauperis, RE #16. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • (#8) Update fee status change to pending in the district court. Check d.c. for ruling on RE #10. (SSS) [Entered: 01/06/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Deficiency notice filed in District Court 12/12/2019, RE #14. Plaintiff is informed that within 28 days from the date of this notice he must submit the $505.00 filing fee or, alternatively, file the required documents to proceed in forma pauperis. (SSS) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Richard Soldan Certificate of Service: 11/13/2019. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TENDERED Motion for Pauper Status. Received from Party Richard Soldan. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORRESPONDENCE: Copy of NOA and Declaration of Inmate Filing. by Richard Soldan. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#3) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (SSS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Richard Soldan. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.