This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:24 (UTC).

Richard Sapienza v. David Trahan, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Richard Sapienza filed an Other lawsuit against David Trahan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30563

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BEN D. DAVIS

TARRYTOWN VENTURES, L.P.

DAVID O. TRAHAN

CHEM ADVANCES, L.L.C.

ADVANCED APPLIED RESEARCH, L.L.C.

WAYNE CUTRER

CYPRESS TECHNOLOGIES, L.L.C.

DOWNHOLE CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD SAPIENZA, Individually and/or Derivatively as Member and Manager, on behalf of Advanced Applied Research, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Martin Lodholz Esq.

Attorney at Matthews, Lawson, McCutcheon & Joseph, P.L.L.C.

2000 Bering Drive

Houston, TX 77057-0000

Steven Charles Lanza Esq.

1200 Camellia Boulevard

Lafayette, LA 70508-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Monique Marie Lafontaine

2237 N. Hullen Street

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Richard Sapienza. [19-30563] (CB) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102474-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Richard Sapienza [19-30563] (LLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:57 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Richard Sapienza advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 07/25/2019 via clerk - Attorney for Appellant: Lafontaine; Attorney for Appellees: Lanza, Lodholz; email - Attorney for Appellant: Lafontaine; Attorney for Appellees: Lanza, Lodholz [19-30563] (Monique Marie Lafontaine ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Sapienza [19-30563] (LLL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:09 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Richard Sapienza. Extension Granted to and including 10/16/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/16/2019 for Appellant Richard Sapienza [19-30563] (SB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 07:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Richard Sapienza. [19-30563] (CB) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30563] (CB) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 6:16-CV-1701. Electronic ROA due on 08/12/2019. [19-30563] (AGL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Richard Sapienza advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 07/25/2019 via clerk - Attorney for Appellant: Lafontaine; Attorney for Appellees: Lanza, Lodholz; email - Attorney for Appellant: Lafontaine; Attorney for Appellees: Lanza, Lodholz [19-30563] (Monique Marie Lafontaine ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102474-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Richard Sapienza [19-30563] (LLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Sapienza [19-30563] (LLL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less