Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 06:00:59 (UTC).

Richard Kaul v. Christopher Christie, et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Richard Kaul filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Christopher Christie. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3113

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION

GEICO CASUALTY CO

LINDY WASHBURN

CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE

AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS

SCARINCI & HOLLENBECK

WILLIAM MITCHELL

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

TD BANK

ROBERT HEARY

CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS

KENNETH J. HOLLENBECK

MARC COHEN

ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM

ANDREW KAUFMAN

WILLIAM ROEDER

NORTH AMERICAN SPINE SOCIETY

CHRISTOPHER WOLFA, MD

STEVEN LOMAZOW

GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI

Defendant / Appellees and Not Classified By Court

CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS

CHRISTOPHER WOLFA, MD

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

John J. Robertelli Esq.

Attorney at Rivkin Radler

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North, Suite 501

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Gene Y. Kang Esq.

Attorney at Rivkin Radler

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North, Suite 501

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Robert J. McGuire Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Daniel M. Vannella Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

Division Of Law, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Sophia A. Perna Esq.

Attorney at Milber Makris Plousadis & Seiden

1000 Woodbury Road, Suite 402

Woodbury, NY 11797

David J. Montag Esq.

Attorney at Milber Makris Plousdais & Seiden

709 Westchester Avenue, Suite 300

White Plains, NY 10604

Michael P. Chipko Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

200 Campus Drive, 4Th Floor

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Stewart M. Leviss Esq.

Attorney at Berkowitz Lichtstein Kuritsky Giasullo & Gross

75 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

William T. Marshall Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause

103 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Edward G. Sponzilli Esq.

Attorney at Norris McLaughlin

400 Crossing Boulevard, 8Th Floor

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

Thomas J. Cafferty Esq.

Attorney at Gibbons

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

Other Attorneys

David J. D'Aloia Esq.

Attorney at Saiber

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Geri L. Albin Esq.

Attorney at Saiber

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor, Suite 1000

Newark, NJ 07102

Marc D. Haefner Esq.

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Autumn M. McCourt Esq.

Attorney at Brach Eichler

101 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Richard Malagiere Esq.

407 Sette Drive

Paramus, NJ 07652

Charles X. Gormally Esq.

Attorney at Brach Eichler

101 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Liza M. Walsh Esq.

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Kenneth S. Merber Esq.

Attorney at Callan Koster Brady & Brennan

One Whitehall Street

New York, NY 10004

Erdal A. Turnacioglu Esq.

Attorney at O'Toole Scrivo Fernandez Weiner Van Lieu

14 Village Park Road

Cedar Grove, NJ 07921

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt. Service made on 10/31/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 10/30/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:19 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TD Bank, filed. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:31 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq., Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) TD Bank, N.A. and Diveyesh Kothari. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:05 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (JK) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. McGuire on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher J. Christie, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, William Roader, Jeffrey Chiesa, Esq., Lewis Stein, Esq., Howard Solomon, Esq., Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski, and Andrew Kaufman. [19-3113] --[Edited 10/17/2019 by JK] (RJM) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:56 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Geri L. Albin, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, David J. D'Aloia, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, Charles X. Gormally, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Gene Y. Kang, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq. for TD Bank and Divesh Kothari, Autumn M. McCourt, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Robert J. McGuire, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman, Kenneth S. Merber, Esq. for Dughi Hewit and Michael Keating, Paul J. Miller, Esq. for American Medical Association and Peter Carmel, Rodney N.T. Richards, Esq. for Frank Moore, John J. Robertelli, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, Edward G. Sponzilli, Esq. for Rutgers School of Biomedical and Health Sciences and Robert Heary, Lewis Stein, Esq. for Lewis Stein, Esq. and Daniel M. Vannella, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/31/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:21 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. Certificate of Service dated 10/16/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter Staats, MD, filed. [19-3113] (SMZ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:56 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee North American Spine Society, filed. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart M. Leviss, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. William Mitchell, Dr. Marc Cohen and North American Spine Society. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:53 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Case Caption

Open Document #4

District Court Order 07/30/2019

Open Document #3

District Court Order 02/25/2019

Open Document #2

District Court Opinion 02/25/2019

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt. Service made on 10/31/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 10/30/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TD Bank, filed. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq., Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) TD Bank, N.A. and Diveyesh Kothari. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (JK) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. McGuire on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher J. Christie, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, William Roader, Jeffrey Chiesa, Esq., Lewis Stein, Esq., Howard Solomon, Esq., Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski, and Andrew Kaufman. [19-3113] --[Edited 10/17/2019 by JK] (RJM) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Geri L. Albin, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, David J. D'Aloia, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, Charles X. Gormally, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Gene Y. Kang, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq. for TD Bank and Divesh Kothari, Autumn M. McCourt, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Robert J. McGuire, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman, Kenneth S. Merber, Esq. for Dughi Hewit and Michael Keating, Paul J. Miller, Esq. for American Medical Association and Peter Carmel, Rodney N.T. Richards, Esq. for Frank Moore, John J. Robertelli, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, Edward G. Sponzilli, Esq. for Rutgers School of Biomedical and Health Sciences and Robert Heary, Lewis Stein, Esq. for Lewis Stein, Esq. and Daniel M. Vannella, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/31/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. Certificate of Service dated 10/16/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter Staats, MD, filed. [19-3113] (SMZ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah M. Ziolkowski, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) The American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter S. Staats, M.D.. [19-3113] (SMZ) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. D'Aloia on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Richard Crist. [19-3113] (DJD) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey D. Noonan, Sr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Thomas Peterson. [19-3113] (JDN) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Lindy Washburn, filed. on behalf of Appellee North Jersey Media, filed. [19-3113] (TJC) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq., GIBBONS P.C. on behalf of Appellee(s) Fourth Edition Inc. f/k/a North Jersey Media Inc. and Lindy Washburn. [19-3113] (TJC) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee North American Spine Society, filed. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart M. Leviss, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. William Mitchell, Dr. Marc Cohen and North American Spine Society. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 10/03/2019. Certificate of Service dated 09/23/2019. Service made by ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD in District Court No. 2-16-cv-02364. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians is a litigant