This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/06/2020 at 06:02:35 (UTC).

Richard Chichakli v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Richard Chichakli filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10018

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

URS CORPORATION FEDERAL SERVICE DIVISION OF RIVERSIDE CALIFORNIA

JUSTICE MANAGEMENT DIVISION

MICHAEL DONDARSKI, Assistant Director of Enforcement OFAC

DEA

UNITED STATES ATTORNEY IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

OFAC, United States Department of Treasury and its Office of Foreign Assets Control

FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT SECTION, Tort Branch US DOJ

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FBI, United States Department of Justice including the Federal Bureau of Investigation

THERESA NEWMAN

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD A. CHICHAKLI

Plano, TX 75074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard A. Chichakli

2625 Van Buren Drive

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Dawn Whalen Theiss

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts - Appellant

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli in 20-10018 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes They require: Pro se provided only (2) copies of record excerpts, (4) are required # of Copies Provided: 2. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Record Excerpts Due on 03/03/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 02/18/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Richard A. Chichakli. Date of service: 02/11/2020 via email - Appellant Chichakli; Attorney for Appellee: Theiss [20-10018] (Richard A. Chichakli ) [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 03/11/2020 for Appellee United States of America. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/18/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Richard A. Chichakli. Date of service: 02/10/2020 via email - Appellant Chichakli; Attorney for Appellee: Theiss [20-10018] (Richard A. Chichakli ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9241262-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/31/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9241262-2]. Date of service: 01/26/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER denying Motion to amend caption filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9233550-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Dawn Whalen Theiss for Appellee USA in 20-10018 [20-10018] (RSM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/04/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10018] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Dawn Whalen Theiss for USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10018] (Dawn Whalen Theiss ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER denying Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9233548-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO IN SUPPORT of Motion to amend caption [ # 9233550-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli to amend caption [9233550-2]. Date of service: 01/14/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9233548-2]. Date of service: 01/14/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:19-CV-372. Electronic ROA due on 01/24/2020. [20-10018] (MRW) [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9226167-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-10018] (MRW) [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [20-10018] (LEF) [Entered: 01/06/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant

Latest cases where DEA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dawn Whalen Theiss(Designation Retained)